EP2449257 - WIND TURBINE PROVIDING GRID SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARNOWSKI, Germán Claudio I.H. Mundts Vej 4a 2830 Virum / DK | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2018/08] |
Former [2012/19] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10728608.0 | 25.06.2010 | [2018/08] | WO2010EP03903 | Priority number, date | EP20090163969 | 29.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09163969 | US20090221134P | 29.06.2009 Original published format: US 221134 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011000531 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2449257 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2449257 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D7/04 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
F03D7/0276 (EP,US);
H02P9/107 (US);
F03D7/0284 (EP,US);
F03D7/042 (EP,US);
F03D9/255 (EP,US);
F03D15/10 (EP,US);
F03D80/80 (EP,US);
F05B2270/101 (EP,US);
F05B2270/1033 (EP,US);
F05B2270/1041 (EP,US);
F05B2270/327 (EP,US);
F05B2270/337 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | F03D7/04, F03D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDRAD, DAS EINE UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES STROMNETZES BEREITSTELLT | [2017/48] | English: | WIND TURBINE PROVIDING GRID SUPPORT | [2012/19] | French: | ÉOLIENNE FOURNISSANT UN SUPPORT DE GRILLE | [2017/48] |
Former [2012/19] | WINDKRAFTANLAGE ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES STROMNETZES | ||
Former [2012/19] | ÉOLIENNE FOURNISSANT UN SUPPORT DE GRILLE | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 19.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2010 | AL | 21.02.2018 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | LU | 25.06.2018 | MT | 25.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1467463 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [XD]WO2005025026 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1,15,16 * abstract *; | [XD] - PRILLWITZ F ET AL, "Primärregelung mit Windkraftanlagen", ETG-WORKSHOP NEUE DEZENTRALE VERSORGUNGSSTRUKTUREN, 19.-20.02.2003, FRANKFURT/M,, (20030219), pages 1 - 6, URL: www.e-technik.uni-rostock.de/ee/download/publications_EEV/uni_hro_pub l33_etg_frankfurt_2003.pdf, (20100208), XP002473463 [XD] 1-16 * pages 1,3; figure 4 * | [XD] - HOLST A ET AL, "Netzregelverhalten von Windkraftanlagen", SICHERE UND ZUVERLÄSSIGE SYSTEMFÜHRUNG VON KRAFTWERK UND NETZ IM ZEICHEN DER DEREGULIERUNG TAGUNG; MÜNCHEN, 21. UND 22. MAI 2003 - VDI/VDE-GESELLSCHAFT MESS- UND AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK, VDI-VERLAG, DÜSSELDORF, DE, ISBN 978-3-18-091747-4, (20030521), pages 1 - 15, URL: www.e-technik.uni-rostock.de/ee/download/publications_EEV/uni_hro_pub l35_WKA_2003.pdf, (20100208), XP002473464 [XD] 1-16 * page 5 - page 10; figures 2-7 * | [XD] - ULLAH N R ET AL, "Temporary Primary Frequency Control Support by Variable Speed Wind Turbinesâ Potential and Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080501), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0885-8950, pages 601 - 612, XP011206797 [XD] 1-16 * page 602 - page 604; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | DE10022974 | WO2005025026 |