EP2432647 - WRITING IMPLEMENT WITH MAGNETIC REPULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92110 Clichy / FR | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLION, Franck 14 ruelle du Crocq F-95270 Asnieres Sur Oise / FR | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10728780.7 | 18.05.2010 | WO2010FR50961 | Priority number, date | FR20090053337 | 19.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0953337 | [2012/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010133800 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432647 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B43K24/02 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
B43K24/02 (EP,US);
B43K24/06 (EP,US);
B43K25/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | SCHREIBUTENSIL MIT MAGNETISCHEM RÜCKSTOSS | [2012/13] | English: | WRITING IMPLEMENT WITH MAGNETIC REPULSION | [2012/13] | French: | INSTRUMENT D'ECRITURE A REPULSION MAGNETIQUE | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3063419 (DANIEL PARKER) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2557634 (EUGENE COX ISAAC) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 19 - column 6, line 16; figures 1-11 *; | [A]CA2499834 (SUNATORI GO SIMON [CA]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004060697 | US3063419 |