EP2381467 - PHOTOCURABLE TRANSFER SHEET, AND METHOD FOR FORMING UNEVEN PATTERN USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAMIYA Takato c/o Bridgestone Corporation Gijutsu Center 3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-Shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO Masashi c/o Bridgestone Corporation Gijutsu Center 3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-Shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | 03 /
KAIDA Eizou c/o Bridgestone Corporation Gijutsu Center 3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-Shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/43] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10729240.1 | 08.01.2010 | WO2010JP50134 | Priority number, date | JP20090002188 | 08.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009002188 | [2011/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079820 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381467 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, B29C59/02, G11B7/26, B29K33/04, B29K83/00, B29L7/00 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
B29C59/022 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0274 (KR);
B29C35/0888 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/026 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/046 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/101 (KR);
G11B7/263 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2059/023 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTHÄRTBARE ÜBERTRAGUNGSPLATTE, UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN EINES UNGLEICHMÄSSIGEN MUSTERS DAMIT | [2011/43] | English: | PHOTOCURABLE TRANSFER SHEET, AND METHOD FOR FORMING UNEVEN PATTERN USING SAME | [2011/43] | French: | FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT PHOTODURCISSABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE MOTIF IRRÉGULIER À L AIDE DE LADITE FEUILLE | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | Translation filed | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 30.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003071016 (SHIH WU-SHENG [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0031] * * figure - * [Y] 5-7 [I] 2-4,8-11; | [IY]US2003129385 (HOJO MIKIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0193] * * paragraph [0205] - paragraph [0210] * * paragraph [0446] - paragraph [0453] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7 | International search | [X]JP2005515617 (BREWER SCIENCE, INC.); | [Y]JPH10307201 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2007055235 (OBDUCAT AB); | [A]JP2006054300 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2007165812 (OBDUCAT AB); | [A]JP2006156735 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]US2005191419 (HELT JAMES M [US]); | [A]JP2008202022 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2005286222 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0963130 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2007165812 | JPH0963130 | - YASUAKI KITAZAKI, TOSHIO HATA, JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION OF JAPAN, (1972), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 131 - 141 |