Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9672286 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2017 | B2 | US2016048593 | 18.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514924639 | 27.10.2015 | US201013684002 | 07.01.2010 | US201313938100 | 09.07.2013 | US68400210 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9201922 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2015 | B2 | US2013297602 | 07.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US201313938100 | 09.07.2013 | US68400210 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8510303 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2013 | B2 | US2010250532 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68400210 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10437896 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2019 | B2 | US2017223389 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514924639 | 27.10.2015 | US201313938100 | 09.07.2013 | US68400210 | 07.01.2010 | US201715490718 | 18.04.2017 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5681641B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B2 | JP2012514951 | 28.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2749170 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2016 | C | CA2749170 | 15.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010203605B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | B2 | AU2010203605 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2384475 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | A4 | EP2384475 | 09.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102549557B | 09.09.2015 | B | CN102549557 | 04.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105072454B | 19.04.2019 | B | CN105072454 | 18.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201080007395 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011007344 | 28.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US20372 | 07.01.2010 | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010080911 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101635876B | Global Dossier | 04.07.2016 | B1 | KR20110133024 | 09.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US14311409 | 07.01.2009 |