EP2385944 - FLUORINE CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2011/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITTER, Tobias 165 Pleasant Street, 212 Cambridge MA 02139 / US | 02 /
BRASS, Laura 20 Parsons Street Newton MA 02465 / US | 03 /
KEITH, Curtis 115 Pembroke Street Apt. 3 Boston MA 02118 / US | 04 /
WATSON, Alan 13 Cider Mill Lane Lexington MA 02421 / US | 05 /
GREENBLATT, David, J. 136 Harrison Avenue Boston MA 02111 / US | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10729595.8 | 08.01.2010 | WO2010US20544 | Priority number, date | US20090143661P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143661 P | US20090143643P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143643 P | US20090143689P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143689 P | US20090143686P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143686 P | US20090143665P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143665 P | US20090143681P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143681 P | US20090143663P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143663 P | US20090143682P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143682 P | US20090143588P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143588 P | US20090143690P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143690 P | US20090143587P | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 143587 P | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010081036 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2385944 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/20, C07D471/08, C07C211/29, C07C211/27, C07C211/42, C07D471/04, C07D471/14, C07C211/32, C07D267/20, C07D223/28, C07C211/31, C07D249/12, C07D313/12 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07C215/38 (KR);
C07B59/00 (EP,US);
C07C211/27 (EP,US);
C07C211/29 (EP,US);
C07C211/31 (EP,US);
C07C211/32 (EP,US);
C07C211/40 (EP,US);
C07C211/42 (EP,US);
C07C215/42 (EP,US);
C07C217/10 (EP,US);
C07C217/18 (EP,US);
C07C217/20 (EP,US);
C07C217/48 (EP,US);
C07C217/74 (EP,US);
C07C225/16 (EP,US);
C07C225/20 (EP,US);
C07C229/34 (EP,US);
C07C229/36 (EP,US);
C07C233/15 (EP,US);
C07C237/04 (EP,US);
C07C237/10 (EP,US);
C07C243/18 (EP,US);
C07C243/34 (EP,US);
C07C255/41 (EP,US);
C07C271/44 (EP,US);
C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07C59/72 (EP,US);
C07C63/72 (EP,US);
C07C69/63 (EP,US);
C07C69/736 (EP,US);
C07C69/76 (EP,US);
C07D223/28 (EP,US);
C07D249/12 (EP,US);
C07D267/20 (EP,US);
C07D313/12 (EP,US);
C07D333/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/06 (KR);
C07D417/12 (KR);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
C07F9/6506 (EP,US);
C07B2200/05 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US);
C07C2603/32 (EP,US);
C07C2603/88 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/46] | C07D405/06, C07D405/14, C07D417/12, C07D403/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLUORHALTIGE VERBINDUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/46] | English: | FLUORINE CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2011/46] | French: | COMPOSÉS FLUORÉS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2011/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 02.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3641153 (KYBURZ EMILIO, et al) [X] 1 * example 7: the starting material and preparation thereof; formula IIa *; | [XY]WO2005063254 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * in particular claims 1,58,62,63,83; compound 189JO54E in table 1 on page 108 and in example 88; example 86 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]GB1177525 (LEO AB [SE]) [X] 1,7 * in particular claims 1,2,4,23,27; example 3 on page 4, right-hand column, lines 81-84 * [Y] 1-7; | [XYI]US4487773 (TEMPLE JR DAVIS L [US], et al) [X] 1 * in particular claims 1,7,21,22,26 and examples 7(If),8(d),9(e),9(f),9(j) * [Y] 1-7 [I] 6; | [XYI]US4402956 (SILVESTRINI BRUNO [IT], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-7 [I] 6; | [XYI]WO2008081477 (NATCO PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1 * in particular the claims; example 1 third paragraph on page 11, examples 4 and 5; pages 21 and 22 * [Y] 1-7 [I] 7; | [XYI]WO2005117872 (DYNOGEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * in particular pages 23-28 and claims 1,28 and 31 * [Y] 1-7 [I] 7; | [XY]US3972936 (CHRISTY MARCIA ELIZABETH) [X] 1 * the whole document, in particular col. 1; claims 1,2,6,7 and examples 7 (including first and eighth compound in accompanying table) and 12 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]DE2360940 (BARTON DEREK HAROLD RICHARD) [X] 1 * the whole document, in particular claims 1-4,11; examples 1,2; last paragraph on page 3 * [Y] 1-7 | [XY] - LI ET AL, "Synthesis and local anesthetic activity of fluoro-substituted imipramine and its analogues", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20070701), vol. 17, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.04.025, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3733 - 3735, XP022114571 [X] 1 * in particular page 3733, last paragraph in the left-hand column; compounds 5a and 6a in scheme 1 * [Y] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.04.025 | International search | [X]US2007092441 (WADSWORTH HARRY J [GB], et al); | [A]US7108846 (MARCHAND JACQUELINE [BE], et al); | [A]US2006083677 (BRADY FRANK [GB], et al) |