EP2448907 - NOVEL ESTERS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWA, Rolf Fontanestrasse 28 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
BRÜNING, Stefan Humperdinckstrasse 5 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MAURER, Stefanie Schwarzwaldstrasse 25 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10730355.4 | 19.06.2010 | WO2010EP03713 | Priority number, date | DE20091031280 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009031280 | EP20090010268 | 08.08.2009 Original published format: EP 09010268 | DE20091055869 | 26.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009055869 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011000489 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2448907 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/24, A61Q19/00, A61K8/37, A61K9/06, A61K47/14 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/24 (KR,US);
A61K8/0208 (US);
A61K8/37 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | NEUE ESTER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2012/19] | English: | NOVEL ESTERS, AND USE THEREOF | [2012/19] | French: | NOUVEAUX ESTERS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2018 | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/26] | 15.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102007055595 (COGNIS OLEOCHEMICALS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0022] *; | [I]WO9906021 (KIMBERLY CLARK LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-3,8-10 * page 5, line 16 - line 17 * * page 5, line 34 * * page 6, lines 5-6, 14-15 * * page 19 *; | CN1223300 [ ] (FERMENTATION ENGINEERING DEV C [CN]) [ ] * abstract *; | [ID]WO2006097235 (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE], et al) [ID] 1-3,8-10 * page 60; examples 1a,b * * page 61; examples 3a,b * * page 62; examples 5a,b, 6a,b * * Zubereitungen 4, 7, 8, 11, 14, 16; pages 63-66; tables 1-4 * | [I] - RÜSCHGEN, M. ET AL., "Symmetrical Wax Esters by One-Step Re2O7-Catalyzed Oxidation of Fatty Alcohols with Hydrogen Peroxide", FAT. SCI. TECHNOL., (1995), vol. 97, no. 7/8, pages 250 - 252, XP009142425 [I] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * example 1/3; table 1 * | [X] - Goosen, A. et. al., "Autoxidation of nonane and decane: a product study", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1994), Database accession no. 1994:322509, XP002613917 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - GOOSEN, A. ET. AL., "Autoxidation of nonane and decane: a product study", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANS. 2: PHYSICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 3, pages 557 - 562 | [X] - Chowdary, G.V. et al., "Enzymatic Synthesis of Ethyl Hexanoate by transesterification", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:116018, XP002613918 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - CHOWDARY, G.V. ET AL., "Enzymatic Synthesis of Ethyl Hexanoate by transesterification", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 127 - 133 | [X] - Sayama, S. et al., "Esterification of Aldehydes and Alcohols with Pyridinium hydrobromide perbromide in water", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2004), Database accession no. 2004:1128051, XP002613919 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - SAYAMA, S. ET AL., "Esterification of Aldehydes and Alcohols with Pyridinium hydrobromide perbromide in water", SYNLETT, (2004), no. 15, pages 2729 - 2745 | [X] - XU, Y. Et al., "Process for synthesizing ester catalyzed by lipase of rhizopus chinensis", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:455417, XP002613920 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - Chang, R.-C., Et al., "Synthesis of Fatty Acid Esters by Recombinant Staphylococcus Epidermidis Lipase in aqueous environment", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2001), Database accession no. 2001:320333, XP002613921 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - CHANG, R.-C. ET AL., "Synthesis of Fatty Acid Esters by Recombinant Staphylococcus Epidermidis Lipase in aqueous environment", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 2619 - 2622 | [X] - Yus, M. Et al., "Carboxylic acid esters: synthesis from organometallic compounds, alkyl halides, primary alcohols, or ethers (excluding reactions with carboxylic acid derivatives)", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2007), Database accession no. 2007:111478, XP002613922 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - YUS, M. ET AL., "Carboxylic acid esters: synthesis from organometallic compounds, alkyl halides, primary alcohols, or ethers (excluding reactions with carboxylic acid derivatives)", SCIENCE OF SYNTHESIS, (2006), vol. 20b, pages 777 - 793 | Examination | WO2007031220 | WO9207543 | DE19623383 | EP1512392 | by applicant | WO2006097235 | EP0766661 | EP0693471 | EP0818450 | EP0694521 | DE19712033 | - WC GRIFFIN, J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1949), vol. 1, page 311 | - WC GRIFFIN, J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1954), vol. 5, page 249 | - P.FINKEL, SÖFW-JOURNAL, (199608), vol. 122, pages 543 - 548 |