EP2446676 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/32] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDEMAIR, Robert Ängkärrsgatan 3 S-171 70 Solna / SE | 02 /
ASTELY, David Stobaeusvägen 22 S-168 56 Bromma / SE | 03 /
DAHLMAN, Erik Tackjärnsvägen 12 S-168 68 Bromma / SE | 04 /
JADING, Ylva Västmannagatan 81 B S-113 26 Stockholm / SE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/32] |
Former [2012/18] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10730575.7 | 16.06.2010 | [2017/32] | WO2010SE50674 | Priority number, date | US20090220844P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220844 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010151213 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446676 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446676 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H04W56/0045 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/001 (BR,US);
H04W56/0065 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2012/18] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2012/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET AGENCEMENTS DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16195842.6 / EP3139674 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2010 | AL | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009161654 (CAI ZHIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [A] - HUAWEI, "Issues in carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-092377, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090624), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090624, XP050350895 [A] 1-34 * paragraph [02.5] * | [A] - ETSI MCC, 3GPP DRAFT; R2-09XXXX_DRAFT_REPORT_RAN2_66_SAN FRANCISCO_V0.2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090524), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090524, XP050341067 [A] 1-34 * page 51 - page 52 * | Examination | WO2010148404 | EP2432286 |