EP2591431 - COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, COMPUTING DEVICE AND COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Sensing & Inspection Technologies GmbH Robert-Bosch-Str. 3 50354 Hürth / DE | [2020/01] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states GE Sensing & Inspection Technologies GmbH Robert-Bosch-Str. 3 50354 Hürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUSER, Eberhard Herzogin Elisabeth Str. 26 31515 Wunstorf / DE | 02 /
SUPPES, Alexander Bocksbartweg 17a 30823 Garbsen / DE | 03 /
ROTHE, Nils Crappiusstr. 2 30625 Hannover / DE | 04 /
HÖTTER, Michael Orffstr. 11 30989 Gehrden / DE | 05 /
FROST, Anja Deisterstr. 58 30449 Hannover / DE | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater, et al Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/01] |
Former [2013/20] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10730730.8 | 09.07.2010 | [2020/01] | WO2010EP04191 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012003850 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2591431 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2591431 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERTOMOGRAFIEVERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM, DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERTOMOGRAFIESYSTEM | [2013/20] | English: | COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, COMPUTING DEVICE AND COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM | [2013/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2010 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | ES | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | NL | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | IE | 09.07.2020 | LU | 09.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 01.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2004264625 (BASU SAMIT [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0050] * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2006269109 (OKADA KAZUNORI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] *; | [XI]US2008118020 (THIBAULT JEAN-BAPTISTE DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 4,5 * [I] 4-12 | by applicant | US6862335 | EP20090014798 |