EP2387658 - ELECTROMAGNETIC, CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION POWER SPLIT TURBO COMPOUND AND ENGINE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A TURBO COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Truck Corporation 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2017/47] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Volvo Technology Corporation 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEST, Martin Fredriksdalsgatan 10A S-412 65 Göteborg / SE | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Volvo Technology Corporation Volvo Group Intellectual Property BF14100, VGHQ3A 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 10731438.7 | 12.01.2010 | WO2010SE00003 | Priority number, date | US20090144768P | 15.01.2009 Original published format: US 144768 P | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010082893 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2387658 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02B39/10, H02K49/10, B60L11/14, F02B37/00, F02B41/10, H02K49/06, H02K51/00, H02K16/02 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
F02B37/004 (EP,US);
F02B41/10 (EP,US);
H02K16/02 (EP,US);
H02K49/06 (EP,US);
H02K49/102 (EP,US);
H02K51/00 (EP,US);
B60L2220/50 (EP,US);
B60L2220/52 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/435 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | F02B39/10, H02K49/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER LEISTUNGSVERZWEIGTER TURBO-VERBUND MIT STUFENLOSEM GETRIEBE SOWIE MOTOR UND FAHRZEUG MIT DERARTIGEM TURBO-VERBUND | [2011/47] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC, CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION POWER SPLIT TURBO COMPOUND AND ENGINE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A TURBO COMPOUND | [2011/47] | French: | TURBORÉCUPÉRATEUR À RÉPARTITION DE LA PUISSANCE MOTEUR À TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE ET MOTEUR ET VÉHICULE COMPORTANT UN TEL TURBORÉCUPÉRATEUR | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 23.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 19.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0034066 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [Y] 11,13-16 * figures 10, 11 *; | [Y]US2008099260 (ABE NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 35] , [0 36] *; | [A]WO2008078817 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2009325 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * figures 17, 18 * | International search | [A]US4850193 (KAWAMURA HIDEO [JP]); | [A]US2002041813 (FLEDERSBACHER PETER [DE], et al); | [AP]GB2457682 (MAGNOMATICS LTD [GB]); | [AP]WO2009103994 (MAGNOMATICS LTD [GB], et al) | Examination | DE10355563 | CN101262166 |