Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017073351 | ![]() | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | US201213619915 | 14.09.2012 | US201615278759 | 28.09.2016 | US201414510634 | 09.10.2014 | US82516810 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9480677 | ![]() | 01.11.2016 | B2 | US2015025121 | 22.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | US201213619915 | 14.09.2012 | US201414510634 | 09.10.2014 | US82516810 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8883840 | ![]() | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2013072537 | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213619915 | 14.09.2012 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | US82516810 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8450358 | ![]() | 28.05.2013 | B2 | US2010331386 | 30.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | US82516810 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101751378B | ![]() | 28.06.2017 | B1 | KR20120101980 | 17.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012532107 | ![]() | 13.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL241985 | ![]() | 28.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL217285 | ![]() | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3156407 | ![]() | 19.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10731662 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | EP14000690 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2789617 | ![]() | 17.08.2016 | B1 | EP2789617 | 15.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10731662 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102471347B | ![]() | 29.07.2015 | B | CN102471347 | 23.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2764878 | ![]() | 07.08.2018 | C | CA2764878 | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015224493B | ![]() | 15.06.2017 | B2 | AU2015224493 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | AU2015224493 | 10.09.2015 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | AU2010266549 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010266549B | ![]() | 25.06.2015 | B2 | AU2010266549 | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2448943 | ![]() | 30.03.2016 | B1 | EP2448943 | 09.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1012129 | 29.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1117776T | 17.05.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2448943T | 04.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2578779T | 01.08.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1168854 | 11.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20110946 | 31.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20160732T | 15.07.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP10731662 | 28.06.2010 | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA33552 | 01.09.2012 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012000028 | 30.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX342298 | 23.09.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ596903 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12011502619 | 23.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015502323 | 19.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2535667 | 20.12.2014 | C2 | RU2012102896 | 10.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG176307 | 30.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2448943T | 29.07.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP10731662 | 28.06.2010 | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201600203B | 31.08.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TN2011000664 | 24.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI465452B | 21.12.2014 | B | TW201105677 | 16.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | US82516810 | 28.06.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201108960 | 27.03.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2010US40187 | 28.06.2010 | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011002708 | ![]() | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017002085 | ![]() | 05.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015038153 | ![]() | 26.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104650106 | ![]() | 27.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR077252 | 10.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011003335 | 25.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6470866 | 29.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP11011512 | 31.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2600160T | 07.02.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1203192 | 23.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE029658T | 28.03.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY159099 | 15.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20120413 | 13.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20160216 | 11.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2448943T | 30.09.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2789617T | 28.02.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2448943T | 12.07.2016 | T | Priority number | Date | US22142409 | 29.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | EP2789617 |