EP2443675 - LIGHT EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seren Photonics Limited The Enterprise Centre Bryn Road Bridgend CF32 9BS / GB | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Seren Photonics Limited The Innovation Centre 217 Portobello Sheffield S1 4DP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Tao 58 Muskoka Drive Bents Green Sheffield S11 7RJ / GB | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/17] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10731785.1 | 14.06.2010 | WO2010GB50992 | Priority number, date | GB20090010619 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: GB 0910619 | GB20090017794 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: GB 0917794 | GB20100005582 | 01.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201005582 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/17] | GB20090010619 | 19.06.2009 | |
GB20090017794 | 12.10.2009 | ||
GB20100005582 | 01.04.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010146390 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2443675 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
H01L33/08 (EP,GB,US);
H01L33/508 (EP,US);
H01L33/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | LEUCHTDIODEN | [2012/17] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DIODES | [2012/17] | French: | DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 28.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2013 | Decision despatched | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 26.04.2013 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2012 | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0442002 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US2007181889 (ORITA KENJI [JP]); | [A]US2007190676 (CHU CHEN-FU [TW], et al); | [A]WO2007097242 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2008066712 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [XI]KR20080076429 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [XI]US2009087994 (LEE JONG HO [KR], et al); | [E]US2010259184 (KATO RYOU [JP], et al); |