EP2430851 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A SELF-ORGANIZING NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMANKUTTY, Rajesh 111 Codogan Way Nashua NH 03062 / US | 02 /
KOODLI, Rajeev 870 W. McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | 03 /
CHOWDHURY, Kuntal 6 Odyssey Way Andover MA 01810 / US | 04 /
PORIKA, Kalidas 23 Harwell Brook Drive Nashua NH 03060 / US | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10732502.9 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010US35140 | Priority number, date | US20090178812P | 15.05.2009 Original published format: US 178812 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010132884 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430851 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W28/088 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN SELBSTORGANISIERENDES NETZWERK | [2012/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A SELF-ORGANIZING NETWORK | [2012/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN RÉSEAU AUTO-ORGANISATEUR | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1937022 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US2009075648 (REED KEITH [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [I] - NGMN, "NGMN RECOMMENDATION ON SON & O&M REQUIREMENTS", 3GPP DRAFT; S5-090009 NGMN_RECOMMENDATION_ON_SON_AND_O_M_REQUIREMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081223), no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20081223, XP050335477 [I] 1-20 * chapters 2 and 3 * | [A] - SUJUAN FENG ET AL, "Self-Organizing Networks (SON) in 3GPP Long Term Evolution", INTERNET CITATION, (20080520), pages 1 - 15, XP002526917 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | Examination | US2009046599 |