EP2456783 - 17-HYDROXY-17-PENTAFLUORETHYL-ESTRA-4,9(10)-DIEN-11-ETHINYLPHENYL DERIVATIVES, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF FOR TREATING DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAR, Ulrich Isegrimsteig 8a 13503 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHWEDE, Wolfgang Magdeburger Str. 41a 16548 Glienicke / DE | 03 /
MÖLLER, Carsten Pflugstr. 9a 10115 Berlin / DE | 04 /
ROTGERI, Andrea Damwildsteig 21 13503 Berlin / DE | 05 /
BONE, Wilhelm Drewitzer Str. 46 13467 Berlin / DE | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10732868.4 | 08.07.2010 | [2015/34] | WO2010EP04156 | Priority number, date | DE20091034526 | 21.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009034526 | [2012/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011009533 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2456783 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2456783 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07J21/00, C07J41/00, C07J43/00, C07J1/00 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
C07J1/0081 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07J1/0037 (US);
C07J21/006 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | C07J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 17-HYDROXY-17-PENTAFLUORETHYL-ESTRA-4,9(10) -DIEN-11-ETHINYLPHENYL-DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2012/22] | English: | 17-HYDROXY-17-PENTAFLUORETHYL-ESTRA-4,9(10)-DIEN-11-ETHINYLPHENYL DERIVATIVES, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF FOR TREATING DISEASES | [2012/22] | French: | DÉRIVÉS 17-HYDROXY-17-PENTAFLUOROÉTHYL-ESTRA-4,9(10)-DIÈNE-11-ÉTHINYLPHÉNYLE, PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 23.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2010 | AL | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.07.2010 | |
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 08.07.2010 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.07.2010 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.07.2010 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9834947 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * * examples 5, 7 *; | [AD]DE102006054535 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0057115 | WO9834947 | WO2008058767 | WO9615794 | WO9603130 | WO0147490 | WO2006010097 | - U. FUHRMANN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 5010 - 5016 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1985), vol. 26, pages 2069 - 2072 | WO2009EP03249 |