EP2390087 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FRP CYLINDER AND FRP CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura Rubber Ltd. TOC Ariake 3-5-7 Ariake Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | [2012/45] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Fujikura Rubber Ltd. 11-20, Nishi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takato c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 6-12-8 Ueno Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 339-8510 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Norio c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 6-12-8 Ueno Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 339-8510 / JP | 03 /
KIMOTO, Naoki c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 6-12-8 Ueno Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 339-8510 / JP | [2018/10] |
Former [2011/48] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takato c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 6-12-8 Ueno Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 339-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Norio c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 6-12-8 Ueno Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 339-8510 / JP | |||
03 /
KIMOTO, Naoki c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 6-12-8 Ueno Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 339-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/48] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10733416.1 | 14.01.2010 | [2018/10] | WO2010JP50300 | Priority number, date | JP20090011142 | 21.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009011142 | [2011/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010084809 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390087 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2390087 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/16, F16C3/02 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B29C70/32 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2101/10 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/246 (EP,CN,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T428/24058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FKV-ZYLINDERS UND FKV-ZYLINDER | [2011/48] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FRP CYLINDER AND FRP CYLINDER | [2011/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CYLINDRE FRP ET CYLINDRE FRP | [2011/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2011 | Translation filed | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 29.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2010 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.01.2010 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IS | 07.07.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IS | 07.07.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008311326 (FUJIMOTO HIROAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0018] , [0019] , [0049]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US2008268192 (SUZUKI HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-9,14,15,18 * figure 3 and the corresponding part of the description *; | [A]US2007062595 (BHATNAGAR ASHOK [US], et al) [A] 4,16 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 52] , [0 55] *; | [Y]WO2008138838 (ITALICA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 4,16 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 2 *; | [XYI]JPH1176478 (MIZUNO KK) [X] 1,3,6-9,14,15,18 * paragraphs [0017] , [0021]; figure 2 * [Y] 4,16 [I] 2,5,10-13,17 | International search | [X]JPH1176478 (MIZUNO KK); | [X]JP2008093944 (MRC COMPOSITE PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [X]JP2008271875 (DAIWA SEIKO INC); | [X]JP2004121402 (MIZUNO KK, et al); | [X]JP2001205710 (DAIWA SEIKO INC); | [Y]JP2008148757 (SRI SPORTS LTD); | [Y]JPH0623558U (THE FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD.); | [Y]JP2000245880 (FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD); | [Y]JP2007185253 (SRI SPORTS LTD); | [A]JP2006262743 (DAIWA SEIKO INC); | [A]JP2008080555 (MRC COMPOSITE PRODUCTS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006062355 | JP2001096635 |