EP2389245 - CATALYTIC DEHYDRATION OF ALCOHOLS USING PHASE PURE, CALCINED SINGLE AND MULTI-SITE HETEROGENEOUS CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signa Chemistry, Inc. 530 East 76th Street, Suite 9e New York, NY 10021 / US | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEFENFELD, Michael 530 East 76th Street Suite 9E New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
RAJA, Robert 28 Damson Crescent Fair Oak Hampshire SO50 8RF / GB | 03 /
PATERSON, Alexander, James Gartlochbank Coupar Angus Perth PH13 9EE / GB | 04 /
POTTER, Matthew, Edward 8 Bermuda Court 20 Winn Road Highfield Southhampton SO17 1WT / GB | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/48] | 01 /
LEFENFELD, Michael 530 East 76th Street Suite 9E New York, NY 10021 / US | ||
02 /
RAJA, Robert 28 Damson Crescent Fair Oak Hampshire SO50 8RF / GB | |||
03 /
PATERSON, Alexander, James Gartlochbank Coupar Angus Perth PH13 9EE / GB | |||
04 /
POTTER, Matthew, Edward 200 Broadlands Road Southhampton SO17 3AS / GB | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Gordon, Jennifer Claire Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/36] | Jewell, Catherine Mary Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/48] | Goddard, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10733948.3 | 22.01.2010 | WO2010US21882 | Priority number, date | US20090146844P | 23.01.2009 Original published format: US 146844 P | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010085708 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2389245 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/84, B01J29/85, C01B37/06, C01B37/08, C07C1/24, B01J37/08 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B01J29/84 (EP,US);
B01J29/85 (EP,US);
B01J35/643 (EP,US);
C01B37/065 (EP,US);
C01B37/08 (EP,US);
C01B39/54 (EP,US);
C07C1/24 (EP,US);
C07C2529/84 (EP,US);
C07C2529/85 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/24, C07C11/04 (EP,US);
C07C1/24, C07C11/06 (US,EP);
C07C1/24, C07C11/09 (US,EP);
C07C1/24, C07C15/46 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE DEHYDRIERUNG VON ALKOHOLEN MIT PHASENREINEN CALCINIERTEN HETEROGENEN SINGLE- UND MULTI-SITE-KATALYSATOREN | [2011/48] | English: | CATALYTIC DEHYDRATION OF ALCOHOLS USING PHASE PURE, CALCINED SINGLE AND MULTI-SITE HETEROGENEOUS CATALYSTS | [2011/48] | French: | DÉSHYDRATATION CATALYTIQUE D'ALCOOL EN UTILISANT DES CATALYSEURS HÉTÉROGÈNES À SITES MULTIPLES ET À SITE UNIQUE CALCINÉS, À PHASE PURE | [2011/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 12.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | 18.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4605492 (LOK BRENT M T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 44 * * examples 21, 31, 33, 34 * * claims 1-9 *; | [XI]US4677243 (KAISER STEVEN W [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12,13 * column 1, line 11 - line 16 * * column 3, line 19 - column 3, line 43 * * column 12, line 44 - line 68 * * column 14, line 48 - column 16, line 22 * * examples 1-12 * * claims 1, 7-26 * * tables II, A, C, D, I-A * [I] 11,14-17; | [XI]US4704478 (OLSON KURT D [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 5, line 53 - line 63 * * column 13, line 53 - column 14, line 33 * * column 48, line 57 - column 49, line 65 * * column 50, line 42 - line 52 * * column 52, line 6 - line 21 * * column 57, line 1 - column 59, line 23 * * column 88, line 1 - column 91, line 67 * * claims 1-4, 8, 9 * [I] 14-17; | [XI]US4752651 (KAISER STEVEN W [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 68 * * column 5, line 17 - line 43 * * column 7, line 53 - column 9, line 63 * * column 17, line 23 - column 19, line 44 * * column 21, line 49 - column 30, line 9 * * column 34, line 3 - column 39, line 64 * * column 45, line 28 - column 48, line 37 * * column 50, line 10 - column 51, line 12 * * examples 1-9 * * tables I-IX * * claims 1, 2, 7, 9, 10, 12-15, 18-23, 26, 28 * [I] 11; | [XI]EP1142833 (DALIAN CHEMICAL PHYSICS INST [CN]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * examples 25, 28, 93, 95-97 * * claims 1, 2, 16, 19, 39-56 * [I] 6,7,9,11-17; | [X]WO03035549 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12,13 * page 1, line 17 - line 22 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 23 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 4 * * page 12, line 7 - line 13 * * claims 1, 13-16, 18-21 * * page 15, line 10 - line 18 * * page 18, line 27 - page 19, line 2 *; | [XI] - M ZAHEDINIAKI ET AL, "H2O2 oxidation and epoxidation of hydrocarbons and alcohols over titanium aluminophosphates TAPO-5, TAPO-11, and TAPO-36", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (19980725), vol. 177, no. 2, doi:10.1006/jcat.1998.2127, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 231 - 239, XP055043096 [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * EXPERIMENTAL Synthesis; page 231, column r - page 232, column l * * RESULTS AND DISCUSSION Characterization; page 233, column l - page 234, column r * * tables 1-8 * [I] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.1998.2127 | [A] - Rosemarie Szostak, Handbook Of Molecular Sieves, Springer, (19920115), XP002686443 [A] 1-17 * page 31 - page 33 * * page 295 * * page 298 - page 299 * * page 322 - page 326 * * page 408 - page 411 * * page 416 - page 417 * * page 467 * * page 492 * * page 494 * * page 507 - page 509 * | International search | [X]US5141729 (CHANG CLARENCE D [US], et al); | [X]US6540970 (STROHMAIER KARL G [US], et al); | [X]WO2005046867 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al); | [X]US6936566 (MEES FILIP [BE], et al); | [X]WO2007083241 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) |