|
28.10.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
17.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
39 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |