12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
12.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
10.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
28.10.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
27.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
20.11.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.08.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
29.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
18.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.04.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
19.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.07.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.09.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2013 |
First examination report |
|
15.05.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
17.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
23.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
04.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|