EP2451585 - SEPARATOR COMPRISING A VERTICAL ROTATIONAL AXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACKEL, Wilfried Heienkamp 11 59510 Lippetal-Herzfeld / DE | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 10734091.1 | 09.07.2010 | [2017/12] | WO2010EP59912 | Priority number, date | DE20091032617 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009032617 | [2012/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011004014 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451585 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451585 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2451585 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/08, B04B11/06 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
B04B1/08 (EP,US);
B04B11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | SEPARATOR MIT VERTIKALER DREHACHSE | [2012/20] | English: | SEPARATOR COMPRISING A VERTICAL ROTATIONAL AXIS | [2012/20] | French: | SÉPARATEUR À AXE ROTATIF VERTICAL | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2017
ADMISSIBLE Alfa Laval Corporate AB P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2017
ADMISSIBLE Alfa Laval Corporate AB P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | 12.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.05.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.01.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2010 | AL | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | MT | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | AT | 09.07.2017 | GB | 09.07.2017 | IE | 09.07.2017 | LU | 09.07.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
AT | 09.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
AT | 09.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
AT | 09.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
AT | 09.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
AT | 09.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
GB | 09.07.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]DE3627826 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG) [X] 1-6,10,13 * page 2, lines 61-65 * * page 3, lines 4-8 * * page 3, line 64 - page 4, lines 1,9-11; figures 2,3 * [A] 7 [Y] 11,12 [I] 8,9,14,15; | [YDA]EP1508377 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [YD] 11,12 * paragraphs [0025] , [0029]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE102004038613 | Opposition | DE3627826 | EP1508377 | US4430071 | US4067494 | US4005817 | DE1029744 | US2973896 | US2294468 |