EP2456549 - HYDROCARBON FRACTION STEAM REFORMING CATALYTIC REACTOR WITH GAS MIXING AND DISPENSING DEVICE UPSTREAM OF THE CATALYTIC ZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/22] | DEVICE FOR MIXING AND DISPENSING GASES AT THE INLET OF A STEAM REFORMING CATALYTIC REACTOR OF A HYDROCARBON FRACTION | ||
[2017/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states IFP Énergies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYER, Christophe 626 rue de la Brosse F-69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
NICOLLE, André Appartement 218 114, rue Salvador Allende 92000 NANTERRE / FR | [2012/25] |
Former [2012/22] | 01 /
BOYER, Christophe 626 rue de la Brosse F-69390 Charly / FR | ||
02 /
NICOLLE, André 33 rue Lavoisier Appartement 202 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 10734176.0 | 23.06.2010 | [2017/23] | WO2010FR00463 | Priority number, date | FR20090003588 | 21.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0903588 | [2012/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011010006 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456549 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2456549 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, B01J8/04, C01B3/38, B01F3/02, B01F5/04 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
B01F23/10 (EP,US);
B01F25/3142 (EP,US);
B01F25/31425 (EP,US);
B01J8/0492 (EP,US);
C01B3/382 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | B01J8/02, B01J8/04, C01B3/38, B01F5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHEN DAMPFREFORMIERUNGSREKATORS EINER KOHLENSTOFFFRAKTION MIT EINER GASMISCHUNGS- UND GASVERTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG STROMAUFWÄRTS DER KATALYTISCHEN ZONE | [2017/09] | English: | HYDROCARBON FRACTION STEAM REFORMING CATALYTIC REACTOR WITH GAS MIXING AND DISPENSING DEVICE UPSTREAM OF THE CATALYTIC ZONE | [2017/09] | French: | REACTEUR CATALYTIQUE DE VAPOREFORMAGE D'UNE COUPE D'HYDROCARBURES AVEC DISPOSITIF DE MELANGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE GAZ EN AMOUNT DE LA ZONE CATALYTIQUE | [2017/09] |
Former [2012/22] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MISCHUNG UND AUSGABE VON GASEN AM EINLASS EINES KATALYTISCHEN DAMPFREFORMIERUNGSREKATORS EINER KOHLENSTOFFFRAKTION | ||
Former [2012/22] | DEVICE FOR MIXING AND DISPENSING GASES AT THE INLET OF A STEAM REFORMING CATALYTIC REACTOR OF A HYDROCARBON FRACTION | ||
Former [2012/22] | DISPOSITIF DE MELANGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE GAZ A L'ENTREE D'UN REACTEUR CATALYTIQUE DE VAPOREFORMAGE D'UNE COUPE D'HYDROCARBURES | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 05.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2010 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | MT | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | IE | 23.06.2017 | LU | 23.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | FR | 07.08.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | GB | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | DE | 03.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/20] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US5106590 (HOPPER ALEC [GB], et al) [I] 1-6 * column 1, lines 8-14 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, lines 8-43 * * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 27 * * column 6, lines 48-67 * * figures 1-7,12 * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]US4865820 (DUNSTER MICHAEL [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 59 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 33 * * figures 1,2,5,7 *; | [Y]EP1147809 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0018] , [0028] - [0030] - [0041] - [0045] * * figures 2,3 *; | [YA]US2002142199 (GOEBEL STEVEN G [US]) [Y] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] - [0021] * * figure 4 * [A] 2-4; | [A]US2006201065 (LUCAS JAMIE D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] - [0040] - [0046] - [0051] , [0052] , [0056] , [0064] - [0066] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1180393 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0013] , [0029] - [0032] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2008244974 (BARTOLINI ANDREA [IT], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4865820 | US2002142199 |