EP2446228 - ANGULAR POSITION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electricfil Automotive 77, Allée des Grandes Combes Z.I. Ouest Beynost 01708 Miribel Cedex / FR | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Electricfil Automotive 77, Allée des Grandes Combes Z.I. Ouest Beynost 01708 Miribel Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÖLLER, Rainer 3 rue Louis Buyat F-69970 Chaponnay / FR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Thibault, Jean-Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Thibault, Jean-Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2012/18] | Blanchard, Eugène Gilles, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10734277.6 | 18.06.2010 | WO2010FR51237 | Priority number, date | FR20090054273 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0954273 | [2012/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010149910 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446228 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446228 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/22, G01D5/20 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G01D5/2258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINKELPOSITIONSSENSOR | [2012/18] | English: | ANGULAR POSITION SENSOR | [2012/18] | French: | CAPTEUR DE POSITION ANGULAIRE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 21.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2010 | AL | 05.06.2013 | AT | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | ES | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | IE | 18.06.2013 | LU | 18.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
ES | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
LU | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19738836 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0527673 (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE10121870 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3919749 (ELEKTROTEILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,13 * | by applicant | DE19738836 |