EP2451370 - TELEMETRIC ORTHOPAEDIC IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/20] | TELEMETIC ORTHOPAEDIC IMPLANT | ||
[2019/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew plc Building 5, Croxley Park Hatters Lane Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 8YE / GB | [2019/31] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Smith&Nephew PLC 15 Adam Street London WC2N 6LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Darren, James Smith & Nephew Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | 02 /
TAYLOR, Stephen, James, Guy 12A Murray Road Northwood Middlesex HA6 2YJ / GB | 03 /
McCARTHY, Ian University College London Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | [2021/46] |
Former [2014/39] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | ||
Former [2012/20] | Guy, Mark Robert Smith & Nephew UK Limited Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10734295.8 | 06.07.2010 | [2021/46] | WO2010GB01298 | Priority number, date | GB20090011697 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0911697 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011004151 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451370 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451370 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72, A61B5/103 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/4504 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/6846 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/72 (EP,CN,US);
A61B90/06 (CN);
A61F2/46 (CN);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/064 (CN);
A61B6/022 (EP,US);
A61B6/583 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4666 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEMETRISCHES ORTHOPÄDISCHES IMPLANTAT | [2012/20] | English: | TELEMETRIC ORTHOPAEDIC IMPLANT | [2019/33] | French: | PROTHÈSE ORTHOPÉDIQUE TÉLÉMÉTRIQUE | [2012/20] |
Former [2012/20] | TELEMETIC ORTHOPAEDIC IMPLANT | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 23.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2010 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | IE | 06.07.2022 | LU | 06.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
TR | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4576158 (BOLAND MICHEL A G [BE]) [A] 9 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 25 *; | [Y]US2005010302 (DIETZ TERRY [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0045] , [0046] *; | [A]US2006247773 (STAMP CARL M [US]) [A] 1,9 * figures 2,4 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0034] *; | [YD]WO2007025191 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-19 * paragraphs [0051] , [0053] , [0055] , [0056] , [0 58] , [0060] , [0063] , [0068] , [0077] , [0078] , [0080] , [0084] , [0090] , [0100]; figures 1,4-6,112,5,20 *; | [X]US2009116621 (YUAN XUNHUA [CA], et al) [X] 20,21 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0025] ** figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO2007025191 | - BRAGDON, C. R.; MALCHAU, H.; YUAN, X.; PERINCHIEF, R.; KARRHOLM, J.; BORLIN, N.; ESTOK, D. M.; HARRIS, W. H., "Experimental assessment of precision and accuracy of radiostereometric analysis for the determination of polyethylene wear in a total hip replacement model", J.ORTHOP.RES., (2002), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 688 - 695 | - COURT-BROWN, "The epidemiology of tibial fractures", JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY.BRITISH, (1995), vol. 77, no. 3, page 417 | - GRUTTER, "The epidemiology of diaphyseal fractures of the tibia", INJURY, (2000), vol. 31, page 64 | - GUSTILO, R. B.; ANDERSON, J. T., "Prevention of infection in the treatment of one thousand and twenty-five open fractures of long bones: retrospective and prospective analyses", JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, (1976), vol. 58, no. 4, pages 453 - 458 | - HOOPER GJ, "Conservative management or closed nailing for tibial shaft fractures. A randomised prospective trial", JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, (1991), vol. 73, no. 1, page 83 | - KANAKARIS, N., "The health economics of the treatment of long-bone non-unions", INJURY, (2007), vol. 38, page 77 | - LACROIX, D; PRENDERGAST P.J, "A mechano-regulation model for tissue differentiation during fracture healing: analysis of gap size and loading", JOUMAL OF BIOMECHANICS, (2001), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 1163 - 1171 | - LITTENBERG, B. E. N. J.; WEINSTEIN, L. P.; MCCARREN, M. A. D. E.; MEAD, T. H. O. M.; SWIONTKOWSKI M. F.; RUDICEL, S. A.; HECK, D., "Closed Fractures of the Tibial Shaft. A META-analysis of Three Methods of Treatment", JOUMAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, (1998), vol. 80, no. 2, pages 174 - 183 | - MADANAT, R.; MORITZ, N.; LARSSON, S.; ARO, H. T., "RSA applications in monitoring of fracture healing in clinical trials", SCAND.J.SURG., (2006), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 119 - 127 | - PHIEFFER, L. S.; GOULET, J. A., "Delayed Unions of the Tibia", JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, (2006), vol. 88, no. 1, pages 205 - 216 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., "Treatment of Closed Tibial Fractures", JOUMAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, (2003), vol. 85, no. 2, pages 352 - 368 | - SCHNEIDER, E.; MICHEL, M. C.; GENGE, M.; ZUBER, K.; GANZ, R.; PERREN, S. M., "Loads acting in an intramedullary nail during fracture healing in the human femur", J.BIOMECH., (2001), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 849 - 857 | - VALSTAR, E. R.; GILL, R.; RYD, L.; FLIVIK, G.; BORLIN, N.; KARRHOLM, J., "Guidelines for standardization of radiostereometry (RSA) of implants", ACTA ORTHOP., (2005), vol. 76, no. 4, pages 563 - 572 |