EP2452183 - A MOISTURE DETECTING MODULE AND A RECEIVING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fred Bergman Healthcare Pty Ltd. L13, 54 Miller Street North Sydney, NSW 2060 / AU | [2014/50] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Salusion IP B.V. Molengraaffsingel 12 2612 JJ Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROOSMAN, Benno Floralaan 85 NL-2643 HA Pijnacker / NL | 02 /
HOREMAN, Tim Westerstraat 50 NL-2613 RJ Delft / NL | 03 /
VAANDRAGER, Gerrit Stougjesdijk 187 NL-3271 KC Mijnsheerenland / NL | [2013/02] |
Former [2012/20] | 01 /
GROOSMAN, Benno Gerardus de Haenstraat 2 NL-2612 JJ Delft / NL | ||
02 /
HOREMAN, Tim Westerstraat 50 NL-2613 RJ Delft / NL | |||
03 /
VAANDRAGER, Gerrit Stougjesdijk 187 NL-3271 KC Mijnsheerenland / NL | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10734361.8 | 09.07.2010 | WO2010NL50444 | Priority number, date | NL20092003163 | 09.07.2009 Original published format: NL 2003163 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005096 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452183 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22, A61F13/42 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A61F13/42 (EP,US);
A61F2013/424 (US);
A61F2013/8479 (US);
G01N27/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | MODUL ZUR FEUCHTIGKEITSERKENNUNG UND AUFNAHMEEINHEIT | [2012/20] | English: | A MOISTURE DETECTING MODULE AND A RECEIVING UNIT | [2012/20] | French: | MODULE DE DÉTECTION D'HUMIDITÉ ET UNITÉ DE RÉCEPTION | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 18.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4018953 (AUGUSTIN HANS ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * column 1, lines 18-67; figure 1 *; | [X]US5354289 (MITCHELL WINALEE G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 68; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5838240 (JOHNSON LONNIE G [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0016081 (TNO [NL], et al) [X] 13 * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 19; figures 1,3 * * page 11, lines 5-28 * [Y] 6,7; | [XYI]US2003060789 (SHAPIRA SHMUEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0021] - [0025]; figure 2 * [Y] 5-7 [I] 11,12; | [A]US2004036484 (TAMAI SEIICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2004070510 (ZHANG YIMIN [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015]; figures 1-3 * * abstract * [Y] 5; | [A]US2004207530 (NIELSEN WYN Y [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | Examination | US5908411 | JP2008272331 | by applicant | EP1114313 | US2004236302 | WO2006058276 |