EP2454366 - ADHESIVE PATCH WITH ZONASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebæk / DK | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Sanne Hartelius Roedpaelevej 5 DK-3450 Alleroed / DK | 02 /
MALCOVATI, Leonardo Christian X's Alle 71 smw DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/21] | Application number, filing date | 10734658.7 | 14.07.2010 | WO2010DK50188 | Priority number, date | DK20090070070 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: DK 200970070 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011006508 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2454366 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
C12N9/6402 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | KLEBEPFLASTER MIT ZONASE | [2012/21] | English: | ADHESIVE PATCH WITH ZONASE | [2012/21] | French: | PATCH ADHÉSIF COMPRENANT UNE ZONASE | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 12.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9929836 (BOLAKS AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-14 * examples 1-6 *; | [Y]WO03075812 (SALVONA LLC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * example 1 *; | [Y]FR2783423 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0458644 (SCHOLL PLC [GB]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9747283 (ACTIVE ORGANICS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ROSEMARY HARE, "Waste water fom Salmon Hatchery delivers surprise cure for skin ailments", KILDAX PRESS RELEASE, (20071124), URL: http://us-cdn.creamermedia.co.za/assets/articles/attachments/09736_kildax.pdf, (20091019), XP002548834 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | [Y] - ROSEMARY HARE, "Waste water fom Salmon Hatchery delivers surprise cure for skin ailments", SA PHARMACIST'S ASSISTANT, (2007), URL: http://www.sapajournal.co.za/index.php/SAPA/article/view/200/175, (20091019), XP002551083 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | [Y] - Aqua Bio Technology, "Zonase X- The natural exfoliant", (20080516), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20101129101032/http://www.aquabiotechnology.com/index.php?id=10&tx_ttnews[tt_news]=35&cHash=f53b8a0ed8, (20101129), XP002611918 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - BASHIR S J ET AL, "Cutaneous bioassay of salicylic acid as a keratolytic", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20050323), vol. 292, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 187 - 194, XP004752482 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2004.11.032 | by applicant | US5213978 | US5395613 | US6858215 | US6592866 |