EP2451665 - SLIDING ROOF DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto SE Kraillinger Straße 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2013/43] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENAUDIN, Fabrice ZI du Guittion F-85700 Les Chatteliers Chateaumur / FR | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstraße 18 81379 München / DE | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 10734912.8 | 07.07.2010 | [2018/11] | WO2010EP04182 | Priority number, date | FR20090003404 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0903404 | [2012/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011003617 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451665 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451665 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2451665 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/46 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
B60J7/0435 (EP,US);
B60J7/043 (KR);
B60J7/024 (EP,US);
B60J7/047 (KR);
B60J7/053 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | B60J7/043 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | SCHIEBEDACHVORRICHTUNG INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2012/20] | English: | SLIDING ROOF DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2012/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TOIT OUVRANT, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 18.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
07.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Advanced Comfort Systems France SAS-ACS France 5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activités du Moulin Jacquet-ZI no. 2 79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
07.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Advanced Comfort Systems France SAS-ACS France 5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activités du Moulin Jacquet-ZI no. 2 79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2014/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
Advanced Comfort Systems France SAS-ACS France 5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activités du Moulin Jacquet-ZI no. 2 79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Oger, Cyril Pierre Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 FR-35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | 05.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2016 | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.08.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.01.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2010 | AL | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | HR | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | MK | 30.10.2013 | MT | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | SM | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | NO | 30.01.2014 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | IE | 07.07.2014 | LU | 07.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | AT | 07.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MK | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
AT | 07.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
AT | 07.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 30.10.2013 | |
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | |
NO | 30.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4108197 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-6,10 * column 2, line 22 - column 5, line 27; figure - *; | [A]EP1403113 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0039]; figure - * | Examination | DE10046068 | by applicant | DE4108197 | Opposition | US6659541 | FR2845037 |