EP2453876 - HDL COMPRISING A THERAPEUTIC AGENT AND USE IN THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEILHAC, Olivier U698 INSERM - GH BICHAT - CLAUDE BERNARD 46 rue Henri Huchard Bâtiment INSERM 13 F-75877 Paris Cedex 18 / FR | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10734980.5 | 16.07.2010 | WO2010EP60330 | Priority number, date | EP20090305678 | 16.07.2009 Original published format: EP 09305678 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011006994 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453876 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K38/17 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
A61K38/57 (EP,US);
A61K9/1275 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
G01N2800/2871 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | HDL MIT EINEM THERAPEUTIKUM UND VERWENDUNG FÜR EINE THERAPIE | [2012/21] | English: | HDL COMPRISING A THERAPEUTIC AGENT AND USE IN THERAPY | [2012/21] | French: | HDL COMPRENANT UN AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET UTILISATION EN THÉRAPIE | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | EP13185152.9 / EP2676659 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03018047 (ZLB BIOPLASMA AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, par.1; page 2, par.3; page 3, last par.; page 4, par.3; page 5, par.2-4; page 6, par.3; examples; *; | [IY]WO2006100567 (CERENIS THERAPEUTICS S A [FR], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0058] , [0059] , [0066] - [0071] - [0107] , [0111] , [0112] , [0123] - [0125] - [0130] , [0139] - [0145] * [Y] 1-5; | [XY]US2009110739 (LACKO ANDRAS G [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0047] - [0064] - [0066] - [0068] - [0088] , [0106]; figures 1-17; example 3 * [Y] 1-5; | [A]WO2009025754 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [LD] - VAISAR TOMAS ET AL, "Shotgun proteomics implicates protease inhibition and complement activation in the antiinflammatory properties of HDL", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200703), vol. 117, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 746 - 756, XP007911950 [LD] 1-5 * figure 1; tables 1,2,3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JC126206 | [XY] - ORTIZ-MUNOZ G ET AL, "ALPHA 1-ANTITRYPSIN ASSOCIATED WITH HDL INHIBITS ANOIKIS OF VASCULAR CELLS: A NEW ANTI-ATHEROGENIC PROPERTY FOR HDL", ATHEROSCLEROSIS SUPPLEMENTS, ELSEVIER LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1567-5688(08)70006-0, vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1567-5688, (20080501), page 2, (20080501), XP022651508 [X] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 1-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1567-5688(08)70006-0 | [Y] - ABBOUD ET AL, "Alpha1-antitrypsin deficiency", RESPIRATORY MEDICINE. COPD UPDATE, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1745-0454, (20060301), pages 80 - 87, (20060301), XP024989323 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rmedu.2006.01.027 | [Y] - KOUDINOV A R ET AL, "HDL PHOSPHOLIPID: A NATURAL INHIBITOR OF ALZHEIMER'S AMYLOID BETA-FIBRILLOGENESIS?", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY AND LABORATORY MEDICINE, WALTER DE GRUYTER & CO, BERLIN, NEW YORK, (19991001), vol. 37, no. 9, ISSN 1434-6621, page 993/994, XP000996279 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/CCLM.1999.148 | [YD] - RENSEN P C N ET AL, "Recombinant lipoproteins: Lipoprotein-like lipid particles for drug targeting", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS 20010425 ELSEVIER NL, (20010425), vol. 47, no. 2-3, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0169-409X(01)00109-0, pages 251 - 276, XP002273271 [YD] 1-5 * abstract * * point 5: page 265-269 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(01)00109-0 | [Y] - SCHNEEBERGER S ET AL, "Protease inhibitors as a potential target in modulation of postischemic inflammation", DRUG NEWS AND PERSPECTIVES, PROUS SCIENCE LNKD- DOI:10.1358/DNP.2002.15.9.840061, (20020101), vol. 15, no. 9, ISSN 0214-0934, pages 568 - 574, XP009021572 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 571, column l, paragraph last - page 571, column middle, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dnp.2002.15.9.840061 | [Y] - DE CASTRO RIBEIRO M ET AL, "Thrombin in ischemic neuronal death", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.EXPNEUROL.2005.11.017, vol. 198, no. 1, ISSN 0014-4886, (20060301), pages 199 - 203, (20060301), XP024945742 [Y] 1-5 * figure 2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.expneurol.2005.11.017 | [Y] - KATO NOBUYOSHI ET AL, "Effects of trans-4-aminomethylcyclohexane carboxylic acid as an antifibrinolytic agent on arterial wall and experimental atherosclerotic lesions in rabbits", THROMBOSIS ET DIATHESIS HAEMORRHAGICA, SCHATTAUER, DE, (19700101), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0563-4954, pages 85 - 89, XP009139202 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * Discussion * | by applicant | EP1425031 | US5652339 | - BG CHOI ET AL., "The role of high-density lipoprotein cholesterol in atherothrombosis", MT SINAI J MED., (200607), vol. 73, no. 4, pages 690 - 701 | - RC HUBBARD ET AL., "Alpha-1 antitrypsin augmentation therapy for alpha-1 antitrypsin deficiency", AM J MED., (19880624), vol. 84, no. 6A, pages 52 - 62 | - KARLSSON H ET AL., "Lipoproteomics II: mapping of proteins in high-density lipoprotein using two-dimensional gel electrophoresis and mass spectrometry", PROTEOMICS, (2005), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 1431 - 45 | - T VAISAR ET AL., "Shotgun proteomics implicates protease inhibition and complement activation in the anti-inflammatory properties of HDL", J CLIN INVEST., (2007), vol. 117, no. 3, pages 746 - 56 | - PC RENSEN ET AL., "Recombinant lipoproteins: lipoprotein-like lipid particles for drug targeting", ADV DRUG DELIV REV., (20010425), vol. 47, no. 2-3, pages 251 - 76 | - RG NOGUEIRA ET AL., "Endovascular approaches to acute stroke, part 2: a comprehensive review of studies and trials", AJNR AM J NEURORADIOL., (200905), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 859 - 75 | - M MAZIGHI ET AL., "Comparison of intravenous alteplase with a combined intravenous-endovascular approach in patients with stroke and confirmed arterial occlusion (RECANALISE study): a prospective cohort study", LANCET NEUROL, (200909), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 802 - 9 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1995), vol. 92, pages 2313 - 2317 | - LI W ET AL., "Matrix metalloproteinase-26 is associated with estrogen-dependent malignancies and targets alpha-1 antitrypsin serpin", CANCER RES., (20041201), vol. 64, no. 23, pages 8657 - 65 | - UETSUJI S ET AL., "Effect of aprotinin on metastasis of Lewis lung tumor in mice", SURG TODAY, (1992), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 439 - 42 | - AM HOUGHTON ET AL., "Neutrophil elastase-mediated degradation of IRS-1 accelerates lung tumor growth", NAT MED., (201002), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 219 - 23 | - ANDRADE-GORDON P ET AL., "Administration of a potent antagonist of protease-activated receptor-1 (PAR-1) attenuates vascular restenosis following balloon angioplasty in rats", J PHARMACOL EXP THER., (200107), vol. 298, no. 1, pages 34 - 42 | - Z S NEDELJKOVIC ET AL., "Mechanisms of oxidative stress and vascular dysfunction", POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 79, pages 195 - 200 | - N. DHALLA; A ELMOSELHI; T HATA; N MAKINO, "Status of myocardial antioxidants in ischemiareperfusion injury", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 446 - 456 | - A CANTIN ET AL., "Oxidants, antioxidants and the pathogenesis of emphysema", EUR J RESPIR DIS SUPPL., (1985), vol. 139, pages 7 - 17 | - B MOOSMANN ET AL., "Antioxidants as treatment for neurodegenerative disorders", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (200210), vol. 11, no. 10, pages 1407 - 1435 | - JE SCHNEIDER ET AL., "Probucol decreases neointimal formation in a swine model of coronary artery balloon injury: A possible role for antioxidants in restenosis", CIRCULATION, vol. 88, pages 628 - 637 | - S MARX ET AL., "The Development of Rapamycin and Its Application to Stent Restenosis", CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, page 852 | - R.T. CALADO ET AL., "HFE gene mutations in coronary atherothrombotic disease", BRAZ J MED BIOL RES., (200003), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 301 - 6 | - C ALTAMURA ET AL., "CeruloplasminlTransferrin system is related to clinical status in acute stroke", STROKE, (20090219), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 1282 - 8 | - D GERLACH ET AL., ALTERED BRAIN METABOLISM OF IRON AS A CAUSE OF NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES?, vol. 63, no. 3, pages 793 - 807 | - MORALES A; FERNANDEZ-CHECA JC, "Pharmacological modulation of sphingolipids and role in disease and cancer cell biology", MINI REV MED CHEM., (2007), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 371 - 82 | - BELAYEV L ET AL., "Robust docosahexaenoic acid-mediated neuroprotection in a rat model of transient, focal cerebral ischemia", STROKE, (2009), vol. 40, no. 9, pages 3121 - 6 | - KEYES KT ET AL., "Resolvin E1 protects the rat heart against reperfusion injury", AM J PHYSIOL HEART CIRC PHYSIOL., (2010), vol. 299, no. 1, pages H153 - 64 | - DJEU JY; WEI S., "Clusterin and chemoresistance", ADV CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 105, pages 77 - 92 | - RODRIGUEZ ET AL., "Sphingosine-1-phosphate: A bioactive lipid that confers high-density lipoprotein with vasculoprotection mediated by nitric oxide and prostacyclin", THROMB HAEMOST., (200904), vol. 101, no. 4, pages 665 - 73 | - BB WEKSLER ET AL., "Blood-brain barrier-specific properties of a human adult brain endothelial cell line", FASEB J., (200511), vol. 19, no. 13, pages 1872 - 4 | - W LIU W ET AL., "Normobaric hyperoxia reduces the neurovascular complications associated with delayed tissue plasminogen activator treatment in a rat model of focal cerebral ischemia", STROKE, (200907), vol. 40, no. 7, pages 2526 - 31 |