EP2456462 - VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION OF ACUTE LYMPHOBLASTIC LEUKEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerter, Detlef Helmstedter Strasse 12 10717 Berlin / DE | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10734996.1 | 20.07.2010 | WO2010EP60472 | Priority number, date | DE20091034553 | 23.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009034553 | [2012/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011009854 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2456462 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/125, A61P35/02 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
A61K39/125 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
C12N2770/32334 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFF ZUR PRÄVENTION VON AKUTER LYMPHOBLASTISCHER LEUKÄMIE | [2012/22] | English: | VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION OF ACUTE LYMPHOBLASTIC LEUKEMIA | [2012/22] | French: | VACCIN PRÉVENTIF CONTRE LA LEUCÉMIE LYMPHOBLASTIQUE AIGUË | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 10.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.03.2015 | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2016 | 15.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/27] | 02.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003190329 (TRACY STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004018205 (FIRAT HUSEYIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - GROVES F D ET AL, "Infant vaccinations and risk of childhood acute lymphoblastic leukaemia in the USA.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER SEP 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10487630, (199909), vol. 81, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 175 - 178, XP002628573 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - GELLER THOMAS J ET AL, "A case of protracted coxsackie virus meningoencephalitis in a marginally immunodeficient child treated successfully with intravenous immunoglobulin", JOURNAL OF THE NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES, (1995), vol. 129, no. 2, ISSN 0022-510X, pages 131 - 133, XP002628574 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-510X(94)00261-L | [A] - YETGIN ET AL, "Unexpected protection from infection by two booster hepatitis B virus vaccination in children with acute lymphoblastic leukemia", LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20070209), vol. 31, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.LEUKRES.2006.06.024, ISSN 0145-2126, pages 493 - 496, XP005876518 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.leukres.2006.06.024 | [A] - MOSCHOVI M A ET AL, "Encephalitis and myocarditis in a child with acute lymphoblastic leukemia: Role of coxsackievirus B5?", PEDIATRIC HEMATOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY 2002 US LNKD- DOI:10.1080/088800102753541369, (2002), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0888-0018, pages 205 - 210, XP008134282 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/088800102753541369 | Examination | - YEUNG WING-CHI G ET AL, "Enterovirus infection and type 1 diabetes mellitus: systematic review and meta-analysis of observational molecular studies", BMJ, (201102), vol. 342, ISSN 0959-535X(print), page Article No.: d35 | - HEMMINKI KARI ET AL, "Co-Morbidity between Early-Onset Leukemia and Type 1 Diabetes - Suggestive of a Shared Viral Etiology?", PLOS ONE, (201206), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1932-6203(print), page Article No.: e39523 | - European Pharmacopeia, Seiten 815-817 | by applicant | - ROSSIG ET AL., RADIATION PROTECTION DOSIMETRY, (2008), vol. 132, pages 114 - 118 | - KAATSCH ET AL., RADIATION PROTECTION DOSIMETRY, (2008), vol. 132, pages 107 - 113 | - MORI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SEI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 8242 - 8247 | - SMITH ET AL., CANCER CAUSES AND CONTROL, (1998), vol. 9, pages 285 - 298 | - WATANABE ET AL., KANSENSHOGAKU ZASSHI, (1982), vol. 56, pages 977 - 981 | - MA ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2002), vol. 86, pages 1419 - 1424 | - URAYAMA ET AL., INT J EPIDEMIOL, (2010), vol. 39, pages 718 - 32 | - MCNALLY ET AL., BRIT J HAEMATOL, (2004), vol. 127, pages 243 - 263 | - BASTA ET AL., PAEDIATR PERINAT EPIDEMIOL, (2010), vol. 24, pages 309 - 18 | - MCNALLY ET AL., INT. CANCER, (2009), vol. 124, pages 449 - 455 | - VAN STEENSEL-MOLL ET AL., INT J EPIDEMIOL, (1985), vol. 14, pages 555 - 559 | - KAYE ET AL., CANCER, (1991), vol. 68, pages 1351 - 1355 | - YEAZEL ET AL., CANCER, (1995), vol. 75, pages 1718 - 1727 | - FRISK, G.; DIDERHOLM, H., J INFECT, (1992), vol. 24, pages 141 - 145 | - AXELSSON ET AL., J MED VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 39, pages 282 - 285 | - MCNALLY ET AL., BRIT J HAEMATOLOGY, (2004), vol. 127, pages 243 - 263 | - GREAVES, M.; BUFFLER, P., A., BRIT J CANCER, (2009), vol. 100, page 863 | - CARDWELL ET AL., BRIT J CANCER, (2008), vol. 99, pages 1529 - 1533 | - DANES ET AL., J HYG EPIDEMIOL MICROBIOL IMMUN, (1983), vol. 27, pages 163 - 172 | - MILLER R., W., NEW ENGL J MED, (1963), vol. 268, pages 393 - 401 |