EP2445701 - CONSUMABLE MATERIALS HAVING CUSTOMIZED CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratasys, Inc. 7665 Commerce Way Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINNIEL, Robert, L. 1025 Peony Lane North Plymouth MN 55447 / US | 02 /
BATCHELDER, Samuel, J. 2 Campbell Drive Somers NY 10589 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2012/18] | Larcher, Dominique Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, BP 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10735107.4 | 22.06.2010 | [2017/05] | WO2010US39409 | Priority number, date | US20090219612P | 23.06.2009 Original published format: US 219612 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005492 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2445701 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2445701 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/00, B29C47/10, B29C67/00 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP);
B29C64/118 (EP,US);
B29C64/209 (EP,US);
B29C64/227 (EP,US);
B29C64/336 (EP,US);
B29C48/2888 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | B29C67/00, D01D5/00, D01D5/28, B29C47/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSMATERILAIEN MIT PERSONALISIERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2012/18] | English: | CONSUMABLE MATERIALS HAVING CUSTOMIZED CHARACTERISTICS | [2012/18] | French: | MATIÈRE CONSOMMABLE À CARACTÉRISTIQUES PERSONNALISÉES | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 01.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2010 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | IT | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | GB | 22.06.2017 | IE | 22.06.2017 | LU | 22.06.2017 | MT | 22.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 22.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 22.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 22.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 22.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
MT | 22.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6358453 (SLEMKER TRACY C [US], et al) [X] 1,9,15 * figure 7 * * column 6, lines 29-37 * [Y] 3,13; | [YD]WO03089222 (STRATASYS INC [US], et al) [YD] 17,18 * abstract * * page 13, lines 5-14 *; | [A]US2005104257 (GU PEIHUA [CA], et al) [A] 1-20* figure 5A *; | [XDYI]WO2008100467 (STRATASYS INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,5,7-11,15,16 * figure 12 * * page 1, lines 4-7 * * page 3, lines 10-15 * * page 8, lines 23-25 * * page 9, lines 12-13 * * page 10, lines 28-30 * * page 14, lines 17-19, 28-33 * * page 15, lines 2-4 * [Y] 3,13,17,18 [I] 4,6,12,14,19,20 | Examination | US5439623 | DE202006018456U | WO2008112173 | by applicant | US5764521 | US6022207 | US6866807 | US6923634 | US7122246 | US7125512 | US2007003656 | US7169337 | US7236166 | US7255821 | US2007228590 | US2007289996 | US7384255 | US2008213419 | US2009035405 | US7502023 | US2010096489 | US2010096485 | US20100233309 | US20100232909 |