EP2383573 - SCREENING METHOD FOR SUBSTANCE USEFUL AS AGENT FOR TREATING PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUTANI, Takashi c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 02 /
ENJO, Kentaro c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Aya c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 04 /
KUROMITSU, Sadao c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 05 /
IDEYAMA, Yukitaka c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI, Tomoyuki c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 07 /
KURIHARA, Ryoko c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10735787.3 | 26.01.2010 | WO2010JP50937 | Priority number, date | JP20090015118 | 27.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009015118 | [2011/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087319 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383573 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, A61K45/00, A61P31/00, G01N33/15 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/5017 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCREENING-VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ALS MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS VERWENDBARE SUBSTANZ | [2011/44] | English: | SCREENING METHOD FOR SUBSTANCE USEFUL AS AGENT FOR TREATING PROSTATE CANCER | [2011/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE DE SUBSTANCE UTILE EN TANT QU'AGENT POUR LE CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | Translation filed | 28.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 23.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1990335 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [X] 6-8 * claims 1-41 *; | [X] - DAY J M ET AL, "Development of hormone-dependent prostate cancer models for the evaluation of inhibitors of 17beta-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase Type 3", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 301, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MCE.2008.08.014, ISSN 0303-7207, (20080822), pages 251 - 258, (20080822), XP025953176 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mce.2008.08.014 | [T] - DANIELA SCHUSTER ET AL, "Identification of chemically diverse, novel inhibitors of 17-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase type 3 and 5 by pharmacophore-based virtual screening", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., OXFORD, GB, vol. 125, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JSBMB.2011.01.016, ISSN 0960-0760, (20110128), pages 148 - 161, (20110205), XP028088733 [T] * the whole document * * table 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jsbmb.2011.01.016 | International search | [A]WO2007100066 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008149521 (IMMUNO BIOLOG LABOLATORIES CO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH08512292 (THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA) | by applicant | WO9946279 | WO2004006473 | WO03057670 | US2007105862 | WO0107020 | WO2006041874 | EP0563001 | EP0616807 | US5554630 | WO9633194 | WO9817651 | WO9834923 | JPH07133224 | WO9733872 | JP2002193947 | WO2008006790 | - THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 349, pages 2387 - 2398 | - FRONTIER IN NEUROENDOCRINOLOGY, (2001), vol. 22, pages 185 - 212 | - THE JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (1999), vol. 161, pages 332 - 337 | - THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1995), vol. 80, pages 1066 - 1071 | - CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 10, pages 440 - 448 | - STEROIDS, (2004), vol. 69, pages 795 - 801 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 66, pages 2815 - 2825 | - NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 7, pages 34 - 39 | - ENDOCRINE REVIEWS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 152 - 182 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 277, no. 27, pages 24799 - 24808 | - CARCINOGENESIS, (2004), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 2177 - 2181 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, pages 1802 - 1810 | - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2006), vol. 248, pages 233 - 235 | - THE JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 41, no. 27, pages 5457 - 5465 | - BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 12, no. 15, pages 4009 - 4015 | - BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 13, no. 24, pages 6598 - 6608 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 56, pages 3042 - 3046 | - JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 30, pages 311 - 314 | - PROG. MED., (1985), vol. 5, pages 2157 - 2161 | - "Drug Design", Pharmaceutical Research and Development, HIROKAWA PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - The fourth edition of Courses in Experimental Chemistry (Vol. 20), MARUZEN, (1992), vol. 20 | - The fifth edition of Courses in Experimental Chemistry, MARUZEN, (2005), vol. 14 | - COMPENDIUM OF ORGANIC SYNTHETIC METHODS, vol. 1-3 | - The fourth edition of Courses in Experimental Chemistry (VoL 26), MARUZEN, (1992), vol. 26 | - SYNTHESIS, (1982), vol. 10, pages 876 - 878 | - The fourth edition of Courses in Experimental Chemistry (Vol 22), MARUZEN, (1992), vol. 22 | - The fifth edition of Courses in Experimental Chemistry (Vol. 16), MARUZEN, (2005), vol. 16 | - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2001), vol. 123, pages 7727 - 7729 | - The fourth eddition of Courses in Experimental Chemistry (Vol. 26), MARUZEN, (1992), vol. 26 | - MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1997), vol. 11, no. 13, pages 1971 - 1984 | - TREVOR M. PENNING, BIOCHEM. J., (2000), vol. 351, pages 67 - 77 |