EP2391314 - AN APPARATUS FOR TREATING GERD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirk Promotion LTD. Frejgatan 13, Att. 1492 114 79 Stockholm / SE | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 6 rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 12 Rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Route des Iles 2B CH-1897 Bouveret / CH | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/49] | Aurell, Henrik Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 10736111.5 | 29.01.2010 | [2017/18] | WO2010SE50099 | Priority number, date | WO2009SE00051 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/000051 | US20090213803P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 213803 P | SE20090001009 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0901009 | WO2009SE51154 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/051154 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087772 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391314 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2391314 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, // A61B17/00, A61F2/04, A61N1/00, A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
A61F5/0043 (EP);
A61F5/0013 (EP);
A61F5/0026 (EP);
A61F5/003 (EP);
A61F5/0033 (EP);
A61F5/0036 (EP);
A61F5/0046 (EP);
A61F5/0069 (EP);
A61F5/0073 (EP);
A61F5/0089 (EP);
A61N1/36007 (EP);
A61B2017/00278 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | A61F5/00, // A61F2/04, A61N1/36 | ||
Former IPC [2011/49] | A61F5/00, A61F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GASTROÖSOPHAGEALEM REFLUX | [2011/49] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR TREATING GERD | [2011/49] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UN GERD | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 24.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17168764.3 / EP3388034 | EP21198006.5 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 03.05.2017 | |
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005261712 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12,13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [XA]US2008097496 (CHANG ARVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,9-11,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0220]; claim 13 * [A] 7; | [X]US2006229696 (BOUSTANI ROLAND [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004112563 (IMPULSE DYNAMICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 7 * page 16, line 19 - line 25 * * page 37, line 27 - page 39, line 14 *; | [A]EP1743604 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0158391 (OBTECH MEDICAL AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2003021822 (LLOYD GREG A [US]); | [A]US2003163029 (SONNENSCHEIN ELAZAR [IL], et al); | [A]US2004260316 (KNUDSON MARK B [US], et al); | [A]US2005245957 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al); | [A]US2005261712 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2005267596 (CHEN RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A]US2007104755 (STERLING BERNHARD B [US], et al); | [A]WO2008016776 (FULFILLIUM INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008086179 (SHARMA VIRENDER K [US]); | [L]WO2009096868 (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) | Examination | WO2005018468 | EP1929957 |