EP2391315 - AN APPARATUS FOR TREATING GERD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Implantica Patent Ltd. Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2019/25] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Kirk Promotion LTD. Frejgatan 13, Att. 1492 114 79 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 6 rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 12 Rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Route des Iles 2B CH-1897 Bouveret / CH | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/49] | Aurell, Henrik Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 10736112.3 | 29.01.2010 | WO2010SE50100 | Priority number, date | WO2009SE00051 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/000051 | US20090213813P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 213813 P | SE20090000997 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900997 | WO2009SE51155 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/051155 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087773 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391315 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
A61F5/0026 (EP);
A61F5/0046 (EP);
A61F5/0069 (EP);
A61F5/0079 (EP);
A61B17/0469 (EP);
A61B17/0491 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/49] | A61F5/00, A61F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GASTROÖSOPHAGEALEM REFLUX | [2011/49] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR TREATING GERD | [2011/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU REFLUX GASTROOESOPHAGIEN PATHOLOGIQUE | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2013 | 31.01.2020 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004112563 (IMPULSE DYNAMICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2005261712 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]WO2006044640 (BFKW LLC [US], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006229696 (BOUSTANI ROLAND [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1743604 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0158391 (OBTECH MEDICAL AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2003021822 (LLOYD GREG A [US]); | [A]US2003163029 (SONNENSCHEIN ELAZAR [IL], et al); | [A]US2004260316 (KNUDSON MARK B [US], et al); | [A]US2005245957 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al); | [A]US2005261712 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2005267596 (CHEN RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A]US2007104755 (STERLING BERNHARD B [US], et al); | [A]WO2008016776 (FULFILLIUM INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008086179 (SHARMA VIRENDER K [US]); | [L]WO2009096868 (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) | Examination | WO2005018468 | EP1929957 |