|
09.09.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.09.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
179 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
179 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
219 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
234 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
219 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
09.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
162 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
161 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
144 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
152 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
278 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
134 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
133 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
212 |