08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
11.09.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
04.10.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.09.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.05.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
29.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
04.03.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
04.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.10.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
20.09.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
02.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2015 |
First examination report |
|
29.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
02.08.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
02.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.01.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
25.01.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
28.09.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
28.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
28.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
19.03.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
04.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
07.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|