EP2391316 - OBESITY TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Implantica Patent Ltd. Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2019/25] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Kirk Promotion LTD. Frejgatan 13, Att. 1492 114 79 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 6 rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 12 Rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Route des Iles 2B CH-1897 Bouveret / CH | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/49] | Aurell, Henrik Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 10736113.1 | 29.01.2010 | [2019/45] | WO2010SE50101 | Priority number, date | WO2009SE00047 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/000047 | US20090213813P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 213813 P | SE20090001007 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0901007 | WO2009SE00452 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/000452 | WO2009SE51156 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/051156 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087774 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391316 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2391316 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, // A61B17/04, A61B17/068, A61B17/00, A61M25/10 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
A61F5/0043 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,SE,US);
A61F5/0036 (EP,CN,SE,US);
A61B1/2736 (EP,US);
A61B1/3132 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/08 (US);
A61B17/30 (US);
A61B17/320016 (US);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61B17/3474 (US);
A61B17/3478 (EP);
A61F5/0003 (EP,US);
A61F5/0013 (EP,US);
A61F5/0026 (EP,US);
A61F5/003 (EP,SE,US);
A61F5/0033 (EP,US);
A61F5/004 (EP,US);
A61F5/0046 (EP,US);
A61F5/005 (EP,US);
A61F5/0063 (CN,US);
A61F5/0069 (EP,SE,US);
A61F5/0073 (EP,US);
A61F5/0079 (EP,US);
A61F5/0086 (EP,US);
A61F5/0089 (EP,US);
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP);
A61B17/0491 (EP);
A61B17/0682 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP);
A61B2017/00221 (EP);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00411 (EP);
A61B2017/00535 (EP);
A61B2017/00561 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP);
A61B2017/00818 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00845 (EP);
A61B2017/00858 (EP);
A61B2017/07235 (EP);
A61B2017/081 (US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2017/308 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3488 (EP);
A61B90/02 (EP);
A61F2002/044 (US);
A61F2002/045 (US);
A61F2005/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2005/002 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0004 (EP,US);
A61F5/0076 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1054 (EP);
A61N1/37223 (EP);
A61N1/37235 (EP);
H02J2310/23 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP);
H02J7/0042 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | A61F5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/49] | A61F5/00, A61F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON FETTLEIBIGKEIT | [2011/49] | English: | OBESITY TREATMENT | [2011/49] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2010 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | IE | 29.01.2020 | LU | 29.01.2020 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.01.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004044354 (GANNOE JAMES [US], et al); | [A]WO2005105003 (SYNECOR LLC [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO0158391 (OBTECH MEDICAL AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2003021822 (LLOYD GREG A [US]); | [A]US2005245957 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al); | [A]US2005261712 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2005267596 (CHEN RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A]US2007104755 (STERLING BERNHARD B [US], et al); | [A]WO2008016776 (FULFILLIUM INC [US], et al); | [L]WO2009096865 (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) |