Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
17.05.2013 | Change - representative | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
01.03.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.02.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.06.2012 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
08.06.2012 | Change - classification | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
08.06.2012 | Change - classification | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
08.04.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
04.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.10.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
07.10.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
02.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.07.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.08.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.08.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |