Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8335638 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2012 | B2 | US2010217509 | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15419509 | 20.02.2009 | US71022210 | 22.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2399250 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15419509 | 20.02.2009 | WO2010US24948 | 22.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010096779 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2011 | A3 | WO2010096779 | 26.08.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15419509 | 20.02.2009 |