EP2462423 - SAMPLE HOLDER FOR CLAMPING WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/24] | SPECIMEN HOLDER FOR CLAMPING WORKPIECES | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zwick GmbH & Co. KG August-Nagel-Strasse 11 89079 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Zwick GmbH & Co. Kg August-Nagel-Strasse 11 89079 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Zwick GmbH&Co. Kg August-Nagel-Strasse 11 89079 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANSER, Franz Auf dem Berg 1/1 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Dziewior, Joachim Ensingerstrasse 21 89073 Ulm / DE | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 10736963.9 | 04.06.2010 | [2016/38] | WO2010DE00640 | Priority number, date | DE20091036246 | 05.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009036246 | [2012/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011015167 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462423 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462423 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/04, B23B31/16, B23B31/177 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
G01N3/04 (EP,US);
B23B31/16254 (EP,US);
B23B31/16287 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | G01N3/04, G01N3/08, B23B31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENHALTER ZUM SPANNEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2012/24] | English: | SAMPLE HOLDER FOR CLAMPING WORKPIECES | [2016/11] | French: | PORTE-ÉCHANTILLON POUR LE SERRAGE DES PIÈCES | [2016/11] |
Former [2012/24] | SPECIMEN HOLDER FOR CLAMPING WORKPIECES | ||
Former [2012/24] | PORTE-ÉCHANTILLON POUR SERRER DES PIÈCES | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2010 | AL | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | IT | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | MT | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | IE | 04.06.2017 | LU | 04.06.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 21.09.2016 | |
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2660440 (KURTZ HERMAN C) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 25 *; | [XI]US3908449 (ZUBER GUENTER) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * figure - * * column 2, line 21 - column 6, line 48 * [I] 2-5; | [A]US4019378 (KELLER GUENTER, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure - ** column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]DE19816639 (STEINER WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure - * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 18 * | Examination | DE19926408 |