EP2451292 - A DRINKABLE ACIDIFIED DAIRY PRODUCT BASED ON ACID WHEY AND A PROCESS OF PREPARING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arla Foods amba Sønderhøj 14 8260 Viby J / DK | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Claus Sønderhøj 14 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Torben Sønderhøj 14 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | 03 /
BØJLESEN, Lene Sønderhøj 14 DK-8260 Viby J / DK | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Østergaard, Steen Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Østergaard, Steen Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 10736977.9 | 09.07.2010 | WO2010DK50183 | Priority number, date | DK20090070059 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: DK 200970059 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011003426 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2451292 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451292 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23C3/03 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C21/06 (EP,CN,US);
A23C21/026 (EP,US);
A23C21/08 (CN);
A23C3/03 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54246, A23V2250/54252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRINKBARES GESÄUERTES MILCHPRODUKT AUF DER BASIS VON SAUERMOLKE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/20] | English: | A DRINKABLE ACIDIFIED DAIRY PRODUCT BASED ON ACID WHEY AND A PROCESS OF PREPARING IT | [2012/20] | French: | BOISSON LACTEE ACIDIFIEE A BASE DE LACTOSERUM ACIDE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/20] | BOISSON LACTÉE ACIDIFIÉE À BASE DE LACTOSÉRUM ACIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | SM | 11.09.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1492981 (HILL MYRON F) [A] 1-38 * page 1, line 60 - page 3, line 34 * * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US4110476 (RHODES KENNETH H) [Y] 1-28,30-37 * column 8, line 31 - line 33 * * page 11; example 1 * * claims 1-19 * * column 4, paragraph 39 - paragraph 43 * * column 9, line 60 - line 65 * * column 10, line 35 - line 38 *; | [A]US4435432 (KLUPSCH HANS J [DE]) [A] 1-38 * column 4; examples 1-2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0471904 (MILPAK INC [US]) [A] 1-38 * page 6; example II *; | [A]WO2005016015 (FONTERRA CO OPERATIVE GROUP [NZ], et al) [A] 1-38* page 6 - page 13; examples 1-4; claims 1-9 *; | [XY]WO2008092458 (ARLA FOODS AMBA [DK], et al) [X] 29,38 * claims 1-36 * * page 15 - page 21; example 1; table 1.2 * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-28,30-37 | by applicant | WO2008092458 |