|
18.08.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |