Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014271971 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184437 | 19.02.2014 | US201113378533 | 15.12.2011 | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8703031 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2014 | B2 | US2012091617 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105038893 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201080029701 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102481747B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102481747 | 30.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2765582 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | C | CA2765582 | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2488359 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2015 | B1 | EP2488359 | 22.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2528376 | 20.09.2014 | C2 | RU2012100314 | 27.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA106377 | 26.08.2014 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010PL00049 | 18.06.2010 | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010147493 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE026155T | 30.05.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL218588B | 30.01.2015 | B1 | PL388314 | 21.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL38831409 | 18.06.2009 |