EP2467625 - BEARING ARRANGEMENT FOR A SHIFT SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | ASSEMBLY FOR SUPPORTING A GEAR SHIFT RAIL | ||
[2013/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBERT, Lasse Schlüsselfelderstraße 9 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [2012/26] | Application number, filing date | 10737861.4 | 22.07.2010 | WO2010EP60630 | Priority number, date | DE20091037867 | 18.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009037867 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020674 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467625 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467625 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
F16H63/30 (EP);
F16H59/70 (EP);
F16H2063/3079 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR LAGERUNG EINER SCHALTSCHIENE | [2012/26] | English: | BEARING ARRANGEMENT FOR A SHIFT SHAFT | [2013/11] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE PALIER D'UNE TIGE DE COMMANDE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/26] | ASSEMBLY FOR SUPPORTING A GEAR SHIFT RAIL | ||
Former [2012/26] | ENSEMBLE DESTINÉ À SUPPORTER UNE TIGE DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2010 | AL | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MK | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | SM | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | IE | 22.07.2013 | LU | 22.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MK | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
LU | 22.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MK | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102006006615 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0028] , [0029] *; | [X]EP1152174 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,11 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE102007016751 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraph [0018] *; | [A]EP1548333 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4223718 | DE102004053205 |