Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2456699 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50865509 | 24.07.2009 | WO2010US42728 | 21.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2769094 | 30.12.2014 | C | CA2769094 | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50865509 | 24.07.2009 | WO2010US42728 | 21.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012001038 | 14.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US50865509 | 24.07.2009 | WO2010US42728 | 21.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011011502 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50865509 | 24.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8157200 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2012 | B2 | US2011017860 | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50865509 | 24.07.2009 |