EP2456699 - PROCESS FOR WINDING A WEB MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUGHN, Jeffrey, Moss 9915 Kittywood Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45252 / US | 02 /
RUSSELL, Matthew, Alan 9 Ambergreen Court Monroe Ohio 45044 / US | 03 /
LOCKWOOD, Frederick, Edward 8740 Althaus Road Cincinnati Ohio 45247 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 10738084.2 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US42728 | Priority number, date | US20090508655 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 508655 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011502 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456699 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/22, B65H19/22 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B65H18/22 (EP,US);
B65H19/2223 (EP,US);
B65H19/2276 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41356 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41468 (EP,US);
B65H2404/255 (EP,US);
B65H2406/33 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFWICKELN EINES BAHNMATERIALS | [2012/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR WINDING A WEB MATERIAL | [2012/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ENROULER UN MATÉRIAU DE FILM | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US7392961 (MCNEIL KEVIN BENSON [US], et al) [AD] 1,12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3279716 (HUCK WILLIAM F) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3791603 (LENIUS G) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3704835 (HARLEY ARTHUR E) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3172612 (BESSERDICH ORRIN H) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US1699928 (STONE IRVING I) [A] 1,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7392961 | US5660350 | US5667162 | US5690297 | US5732901 | US5810282 | US5899404 | US5913490 | US6142407 | US6354530 | WO03074398 | US4919351 | US5335869 |