EP2395124 - THIN FILM COMPRISING TITANIUM OXIDE AS MAJOR COMPONENT AND SINTERED SPUTTERING TARGET COMPRISING TITANIUM OXIDE AS MAJOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAMI, Hideo c/o JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 187-4, Usuba Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | 02 /
YAHAGI, Masataka c/o JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 187-4, Usuba Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10738471.1 | 29.01.2010 | WO2010JP51232 | Priority number, date | JP20090025064 | 05.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009025064 | JP20090089653 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009089653 | [2011/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010090137 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395124 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C04B35/46, C23C14/34, G11B7/24, G11B7/254, G11B7/257 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/2545 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C14/3414 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | DÜNNFILM MIT TITANIUMOXID ALS HAUPTKOMPONENTE UND GESINTERTES SPUTTERTARGET UMFASSEND TITANIUMOXID ALS HAUPTKOMPONENTE | [2011/50] | English: | THIN FILM COMPRISING TITANIUM OXIDE AS MAJOR COMPONENT AND SINTERED SPUTTERING TARGET COMPRISING TITANIUM OXIDE AS MAJOR COMPONENT | [2011/50] | French: | COUCHE MINCE COMPRENANT DE L'OXYDE DE TITANE EN TANT QUE COMPOSANT PRINCIPAL ET CIBLE FRITTÉE DE PULVÉRISATION COMPRENANT DE L'OXYDE DE TITANE EN TANT QUE COMPOSANT PRINCIPAL | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2011 | Translation filed | 18.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 30.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1029832 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3,11 * example -; claim - ** sputtering as an alternative method for forming the film; paragraph [0034] *; | [A]JP2000335940 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1,4,9 * paragraph [0049]; example -; table 6 * * abstract *; | [A]JP2001355065 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1,4,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0018]; example 6; table 3 * | International search | [Y]JPH08287515 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2001240960 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JP2002145622 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [X]JP2002206164 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [X]JP2006144052 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X] - D. L. HOU ET AL., "Room-temperature ferromagnetism in Cu-doped Ti02 thin films", THIN SOLID FILMS, (2008), vol. 516, pages 3223 - 3226, XP022500331 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0049-3848(80)90037-7 | [X] - A. K. PRADHAN ET AL., "Ferromagnetism in nanocrystalline epitaxial Co:Ti02 thin films", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2005), vol. 86, pages 222503-1 - 222503-3, XP012065740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1944209 | [X] - N. H. HONG ET AL., "Distribution of dopant in Fe:Ti02 and Ni:Ti02 thin films", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (2004), vol. 281, pages 347 - 352, XP004568442 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmmm.2004.04.125 | [Y] - D. MARDARE ET AL., "Optical dispersion analysis of Ti02 thin films based on variable-angle spectroscopic ellipsometry measurements", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, (1999), vol. 68, pages 42 - 47, XP004363462 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(99)00335-9 | by applicant | JP2006079710 | JP3836163B | - "Kogaku", TECHNICAL JOURNAL, vol. 26, no. 1, pages 9 - 15 |