EP2394222 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING VIRTUALIZED DATA IN CLOUD COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOK, Frederic c/o NEC Technologies(UK)Ltd. The Imperium Imperial Way Reading Berkshire RG2 0TD / GB | 02 /
BEAUGRAND, Fabrice c/o NEC Technologies(UK)Ltd. The Imperium Imperial Way Reading Berkshire RG2 0TD / GB | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [2013/51] |
Former [2011/50] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam FR-75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10738664.1 | 03.02.2010 | WO2010JP51907 | Priority number, date | EP20090152039 | 04.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09152039 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010090336 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394222 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394222 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F3/06 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
G06F3/0605 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2011/50] | G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VIRTUALISIERTER DATEN IN EINER CLOUD-COMPUTING-UMGEBUNG | [2011/50] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING VIRTUALIZED DATA IN CLOUD COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT | [2011/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES VIRTUALISÉES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE EN NUAGE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 11.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2010 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BE | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | IE | 03.02.2014 | LU | 03.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 03.02.2010 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
TR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.02.2010 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0691619 (RANK XEROX LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 2, line 54 - page 7, line 23 *; | [A]FR2898238 (CUSTOMER PRODUCT RELATIONSHIP [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, lines 19-28 * * page 6, line 22 - page 9, line 16 * * page 12, lines 4-7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003169180 (HARDMAN SIMON F [NZ]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0049] *; | [A]EP1892603 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0048] *; | [A]EP1928154 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] * | International search | [A]JP2007336399 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2009020739 (NTT DOCOMO INC) |