EP2393728 - IN-STORE TINTABLE NON-INFRARED-ABSORPTIVE PAINT AND STAIN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [2019/01] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERTZ, Sanford, Lee 5789 Acorn Court Hoffman Estates, IL 60192 / US | 02 /
GEBHARD, Matthew, S. 219 Fox Street Cary, IL 60013 / US | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10739274.8 | 09.02.2010 | WO2010US23650 | Priority number, date | US20090151105P | 09.02.2009 Original published format: US 151105 P | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091416 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393728 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393728 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32, B65D25/08, B05D5/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
C09D7/41 (EP,US);
B01F33/84 (EP,US);
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/80 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT-INFRAROT-ABSORBIERENDES FÄRB- UND BEDRUCKUNGSSYSTEM FÜR GESCHÄFTE | [2011/50] | English: | IN-STORE TINTABLE NON-INFRARED-ABSORPTIVE PAINT AND STAIN SYSTEM | [2011/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PEINTURES ET TEINTURES N'ABSORBANT PAS LES INFRAROUGES, POUVANT ÊTRE TEINTÉES, POUR MAGASINS | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2015
01.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Altmann, Andreas, et al, et al Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2015
01.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association, et al, et al BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2015/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2015
01.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Mann, Claudia Johanna, et al, et al BASF Schweiz AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 22.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.07.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.06.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/31] | Appeal following opposition | 14.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T2040/17 | 20.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.06.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2010 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | IE | 09.02.2015 | LU | 09.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 09.02.2010 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005095528 (TEXTURED COATINGS OF AMERICA I [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033] ** examples 1-3; claims 1,12-16 *; | [X]WO2006040033 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 22 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-6,12-17,19,20-27 * | International search | [Y]US4424292 (RAVINOVITCH ELVIRA B [US], et al); | [Y]US4546045 (ELIAS RICHARD C [US]); | [Y]US5375634 (EGGER PAUL R [US]); | [Y]US2005215685 (HAINES JAY A [US]); | [Y]US2008257446 (OAKES IAN DAVID [GB]); | [Y]US2008290099 (MACDONALD JAMES E [US], et al) | by applicant | US4427835 | US4468498 | US4469825 | US4594363 | US4880842 | US4920160 | US4985064 | US5036109 | US5041464 | US5157084 | US5409776 | US5510422 | US6454848 | US6458848 | US6616744 | US6989056 | US7157112 | US20080141006 |