EP2462784 - METHOD OF STARTING A DISCHARGE LAMP AND CIRCUIT FOR OPERATION OF SUCH A LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/24] | METHOD FOR ACTUATING A DISCHARGE LAMP AND CIRCUITRY FOR OPERATING SUCH A LAMP | ||
[2013/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states OSRAM AG Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLLISCHANSKY, Thomas Bruderhofstr. 18 81371 München / DE | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 10739332.4 | 23.07.2010 | WO2010EP60716 | Priority number, date | DE20091036645 | 07.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009036645 | [2012/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011015468 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462784 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462784 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/295 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H05B41/295 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM INBETRIEBSETZEN EINER ENTLADUNGSLAMPE SOWIE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SOLCHEN | [2012/24] | English: | METHOD OF STARTING A DISCHARGE LAMP AND CIRCUIT FOR OPERATION OF SUCH A LAMP | [2013/21] | French: | METHODE DE DEMARRAGE D'UN LAMPA A DESCHARGE ET CIRCUIT DE ALIMENTATION DE LA LAMPE | [2013/21] |
Former [2012/24] | METHOD FOR ACTUATING A DISCHARGE LAMP AND CIRCUITRY FOR OPERATING SUCH A LAMP | ||
Former [2012/24] | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN SERVICE D'UNE LAMPE À DÉCHARGE, AINSI QU'AGENCEMENT DE CIRCUIT POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2010 | AL | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.07.2010 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.07.2010 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.07.2010 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CZ | 02.10.2013 | |
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 02.10.2013 | |
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CZ | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2264596 (STANDARDS INST SINGAPORE [SG]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]DE19805733 (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 20; figures 1,2,10-14 * * page 9, line 66 - page 10, line 39; figures 24-26 *; | [A]EP1991033 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]) [A] 1,3* abstract * |