EP2452053 - VALVES FOR STEAM ENGINE WITH ROTATING PISTON AND DRIVE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tuna, Ján Nábrezie mládeze 15 949 01 Nitra / SK | For all designated states Vavrus, Vladimír Stanicná 1062/24 911 05 Trencín / SK | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Belescak, Ladislav Belescak & Partneri Námestie slobody 6 P.O.Box A-24 921 01 Piest'any / SK | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 10739722.6 | 24.06.2010 | WO2010SK50011 | Priority number, date | SK20090050034 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: SK 500342009 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005228 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452053 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01L7/02 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
F01L7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | VENTILE FÜR EINEN DAMPFMOTOR MIT ROTIERENDEM KOLBEN UND ANTRIEB DAFÜR | [2012/20] | English: | VALVES FOR STEAM ENGINE WITH ROTATING PISTON AND DRIVE THEREOF | [2012/20] | French: | SOUPAPES POUR MOTEUR À VAPEUR À PISTON ROTATIF ET ENTRAÎNEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2009005480 (VAVRUS VLADIMIR [SK], et al) [YD] 1-3,5-10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - *; | [YA]GB190914929 (LEWIS EDMUND WOODWARD) [Y] 1,3,5-10 * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 16 * * figure - * [A] 4; | [YA]US4122756 (GRUNDMANN EDGARD) [Y] 1,5-10 * column 1, line 5 - line 14 * * column 3, line 2 - line 34 * * column 4, line 18 - line 33 * * figure - * [A] 2,4; | [Y]GB219049 (EDMUND HAWTHORNE MICKLEWOOD) [Y] 1,2,5-10 * page 1, line 6 - line 18 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 71 * * figure - *; | [YA]GB355268 (ADDISON INVEST COMPANY) [Y] 1,3,5-10 * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 1, line 72 - line 93 * * page 2, lines 6-22 * * figure - * [A] 4; | [A]US2006254554 (ZAJAC JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0032] * * figure 6 * | by applicant | DE19940088 | DE4119242 | US5410998 | WO2009005480 |