EP2448910 - METHOD OF PREPARING NERAMEXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt Main / DE | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLLER, Herbert Quellenstrasse 155A/65 A-1100 Wien / AT | 02 /
PYERIN, Michael Enzersdorferstrasse 3/2/8 2345 Brunn am Gebirge / AT | 03 /
SBROGIÒ, Federico Via Tecchio 62 36075 Montecchio Maggiore / IT | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Ricker, Mathias, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10740144.0 | 28.06.2010 | WO2010EP03921 | Priority number, date | EP20090008466 | 29.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09008466 | US20090269766P | 29.06.2009 Original published format: US 269766 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000538 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448910 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448910 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/62, C07C209/16, C07C211/35 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C07C209/62 (EP,US);
C07C211/35 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/62, C07C211/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | 23.01.2012 | ME | 23.01.2012 | RS | 23.01.2012 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Neramexan | [2012/50] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING NERAMEXANE | [2012/19] | French: | Procédé de préparation de néramexane | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/19] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NERAMEXAN | ||
Former [2012/19] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE NÉRAMEXANE | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SM | 15.05.2013 | LU | 28.06.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MK | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
LU | 28.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MK | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | NO | 15.08.2013 | |
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | NO | 15.08.2013 | |
PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XDAI] - DANYSZ W ET AL, "AMINO-ALKYL-CYCLOHEXANS AS A NOVEL CLASS OF UNCOMPETITIVE NMDA RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20020101), vol. 8, no. 10, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 835 - 843, XP008030349 [XD] 1,4-7,11 * page 835, column R, paragraph L - page 836, column L, line 8; figure 1 * [A] 2,3,9,10 [I] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1381612024607117 | by applicant | - W. DANYSZ ET AL., CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (2002), vol. 8, pages 835 - 843 |