EP2464790 - SCREENING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manshanden, Gerardus Augustinus Maria Hazewaal 1 1671 LA Medemblik / NL | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSHANDEN, Gerardus Augustinus Maria Hazewaal 1 NL-1671 LA Medemblik / NL | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2016/46] |
Former [2012/25] | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10740418.8 | 30.07.2010 | [2016/46] | WO2010NL50488 | Priority number, date | NL20092003345 | 11.08.2009 Original published format: NL 2003345 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011019274 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464790 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464790 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02B8/02 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
E02B8/026 (EP,KR);
A01K73/02 (KR);
C02F3/34 (KR);
E02B1/00 (KR);
E02B5/08 (KR);
E02B9/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | E02B1/00, E02B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIEBVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WASSERREINIGUNG | [2012/25] | English: | SCREENING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING WATER | [2012/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TAMISAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PURIFIER DE L'EAU | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 25.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2010 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | LU | 30.07.2017 | MT | 30.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
MT | 30.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1420508 (WALKER JAMES L) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US1810981 (NOBLE OLIVER E) [A] 1,14 * page 1, line 1 - line 21 * * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 106; figure - *; | [A]WO9815336 (SPIRAC ENGINEERING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,14* abstract * | by applicant | WO9815336 |