EP2396885 - TERMINATION CIRCUIT FOR ON-DIE TERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOSAID Technologies Incorporated 11 Hines Road, Suite 203 Ottawa, ON K2K 2X1 / CA | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLINGHAM, Peter, B. 43 Slade Crescent Kanata ON K2K 2K9 / CA | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10740862.7 | 11.01.2010 | WO2010CA00027 | Priority number, date | US20090151886P | 12.02.2009 Original published format: US 151886 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091497 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396885 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396885 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/00, H04L25/02, H03K19/003 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
H03K19/0005 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/10 (KR);
H03K3/012 (KR,US);
G11C11/4076 (KR);
G11C5/14 (KR);
G11C7/1051 (KR);
G11C7/22 (KR);
H03K19/00361 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0278 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | H03H11/46, G11C5/06, H01L23/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHLUSSSCHALTUNG FÜR TERMINIERUNG AUF DEM CHIP | [2011/51] | English: | TERMINATION CIRCUIT FOR ON-DIE TERMINATION | [2011/51] | French: | CIRCUIT DE TERMINAISON POUR TERMINAISON SUR PUCE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13190616.6 / EP2693641 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2010 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | SM | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | LU | 11.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.01.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.01.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | HR | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5291121 (NEALE TODD M [US], et al) [A] 5* figure 1c *; | [A]US5592119 (YOO SEUNG-MOON [KR]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [XAYI]US2002180479 (CHANG CHI [TW]) [X] 1,2,6,14-16 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0027] , [0029]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031]; figure 8 * [A] 12,13 [Y] 3,8-11 [I] 4,5,7; | [XAY]US7417452 (WANG XIAOBAO [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 2, lines 39-60; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 19-32,41-49,58-64; figure 3A * * column 5, lines 18-41; figure 4B * [A] 1,14,15 [Y] 3,8-11 | International search | [X]US6903581 (CLARK LAWRENCE T [US], et al); | [Y]US2005226080 (LEE JUNG-BAE [KR]); | [Y]US2008290894 (SOHN YOUNG-SOO [KR]) | by applicant | US7417452 |